EP0913793 - Image interpretation method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/14] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1999/18] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Canon Information Systems Research Pty Ltd. 1 Thomas Holt Drive North Ryde, New South Wales 2113 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lennon, Alison Joan 554 Darling Street Balmain, New South Wales 2041 / AU | 02 /
Le, Delphine Anh Dao 11/24 Wolseley Street Drummoyne NSW 2047 / AU | [1999/24] |
Former [1999/18] | 01 /
Lennon, Alison Joan 554 Darling Street Balmain, New South Wales 2041 / AU | ||
02 /
Le, Delphine Anh Dao 11/24 Wolseley Street Drummoyne, New South Wales 2047 / AU | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98308843.6 | 28.10.1998 | [1999/18] | Priority number, date | AU1997PP00096 | 29.10.1997 Original published format: AU PP009697 | [1999/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0913793 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0913793 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | [2000/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0913793 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G06K9/68 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
G06T7/11 (EP,US);
G06T7/143 (EP,US);
G06V10/75 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/06] |
Former [1999/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Bildinterpretation | [1999/18] | English: | Image interpretation method and apparatus | [1999/18] | French: | Procédé et appareil d'interprétation d'images | [1999/18] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/51] | 11.12.2003 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 17.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2003 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 04.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Request for further processing for: | 04.08.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 04.08.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.09.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 05.04.2006 | DE | 06.07.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/15] | DE | 06.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0692768 (FROESSL HORST [DE]) [X] 1-4,10,13,15-23,26,28,31,33-36 * abstract *; | [A]US5617488 (HONG TAO [US], et al) [A] 1-36* abstract *; | [A] - SIMS S R F ET AL, "AUTOMATIC TARGET RECOGNITION USING A PASSIVE MULTISENSOR SUITE", OPTICAL ENGINEERING,US,SOC. OF PHOTO-OPTICAL INSTRUMENTATION ENGINEERS. BELLINGHAM, (19921201), vol. 31, no. 12, ISSN 0091-3286, pages 2584 - 2593, XP000329820 [A] 1-36 * paragraph 3.2.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.60015 |