EP0924668 - Improved self-service terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton Ohio 45479 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Epstein, Howard I. 2 Choke Cherry Road Rockville, Maryland 20850 / US | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | MacLeod, Roderick William, et al NCR Limited Intellectual Property Section Discovery Centre 3 Fulton Road Dundee Tayside, DD2 4SW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | MacLeod, Roderick William, et al NCR Limited Intellectual Property Section Discovery Centre 3 Fulton Road Dundee Tayside, DD2 4SW / GB | ||
Former [2004/50] | Williamson, Brian, et al NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | ||
Former [2004/35] | Williamson, Brian, et al Barker Bretell 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | ||
Former [1999/41] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al International IP Department NCR Limited 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | ||
Former [1999/25] | Irish, Vivien Elizabeth, et al International IP Department, NCR Limited, 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | Application number, filing date | 98309154.7 | 09.11.1998 | [1999/25] | Priority number, date | GB19970026834 | 20.12.1997 Original published format: GB 9726834 | [1999/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0924668 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0924668 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G07F19/00 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
G06Q20/18 (EP,US);
G06Q20/1085 (EP,US);
G07F19/20 (EP,US);
G07F19/205 (EP,US);
G07F19/207 (EP,US);
G07G3/003 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/25] | G07F19/00, G07G3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/48] |
Former [1999/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbessertes Selbstbedienungsterminal | [1999/25] | English: | Improved self-service terminal | [1999/25] | French: | Terminal en libre-service amélioré | [1999/25] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/45] | 15.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.02.2011 | 27.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/24] | 06.02.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/24] | 10.02.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2004 | Request for further processing for: | 04.04.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 04.04.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.04.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH03246672 ; | [X]JPH09161134 ; | [PX]JPH10143715 ; | [A]US4511794 (IMAMICHI TUTOMU [JP]) [A] 1* column 13, line 51 - column 14, line 2 *; | [AD]US5097328 (BOYETTE ROBERT B [US]) [AD] 1 * column A * * column 1, line 18 - line 22 * * column 2, line 18 - line 22 * * column 3, line 1 - line 4 * * column 4, line 31 - line 33 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920131), vol. 016, no. 042, Database accession no. (P - 1306), & JP03246672 A 19911105 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-8 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, & JP09161134 A 19970620 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-8 * abstract * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10143715 A 19980529 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [PX] 1-8 * abstract * |