EP0924631 - Method and system for performing work flow control in accordance with an input state of data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mori, Toshihiko 29-1-102, Akutsu, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | 02 /
Soga, Nobuko 24-1-302, Kamikodanaka-1-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | 03 /
Hosoda, Naofumi 4-18-207, Nishikagaya-4-chome, Suminoe-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | 04 /
Soga, Shuji 24-2-302, Kamikodanaka-1-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | 05 /
Yakabe, Taro 14-34-205, Shukugawara-6-chome, Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98309449.1 | 18.11.1998 | [1999/25] | Priority number, date | JP19970321213 | 21.11.1997 Original published format: JP 32121397 | [1999/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0924631 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0924631 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [1999/25] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP);
G06Q10/0633 (KR);
G06Q10/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/11] |
Former [1999/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zum Ausführen einer Arbeitsflusssteuerung in Übereinstimmung mit einem Eingabewert von Daten | [1999/25] | English: | Method and system for performing work flow control in accordance with an input state of data | [1999/25] | French: | Méthode et système pour effectuer la gestion de flux de travaux selon un état d'entrée de données | [1999/25] | Examination procedure | 07.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/25] | 21.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/46] | 06.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0778535 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,6,11,13,17 * abstract * * page 3, column 3, line 13 - page 8, column 13, line 5 *; | [A]WO9420910 (NAUCKHOFF SVEN [SE]) [A] 1,6,11,13,17 * abstract * * page 7, line 34 - page 41, line 29 *; | [A]US5535322 (HECHT MATTHEW S [US]) [A] 1,6,11,13,17 * abstract * * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 52 * | [A] - MORITA M ET AL, "Interworkflow management: interorganization-cooperated workflow process modeling and management over decentralized heterogeneous systems", INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, Database accession no. 5834580, XP002136685 [A] 1,6,11,13,17 * abstract * | [ ] - TRANSACTIONS OF THE INFORMATION PROCESSING SOCIETY OF JAPAN, NOV. 1997, INF. PROCESS. SOC. JAPAN, JAPAN, vol. 38, no. 11, ISSN 0387-5806, pages 2298 - 2308 | [A] - HAYAMI H ET AL, "Inter-workflow management and support", INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, Database accession no. 5524546, XP002136686 [A] 1,6,11,13,17 * abstract * | [ ] - NTT R & D, 1996, NTT, JAPAN, vol. 45, no. 12, ISSN 0915-2326, pages 1301 - 1314 | [A] - KIMBROUGH S O ET AL, "Message management systems: concepts and motivations", PROCEEDINGS OF THE TWENTY-FIFTH HAWAII INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SYSTEM SCIENCES (CAT. NO.91TH0394-7), KAUAI, HI, USA, 7-10 JAN. 1992, 1991, Los Alamitos, CA, USA, IEEE Comput. Soc. Press, USA, ISBN 0-8186-2420-5, pages 654 - 665 vol.4, XP002136684 [A] 1,6,11,13,17 * abstract * * page 655, column 2, line 5 - page 662, column 1, line 36 * |