EP0920178 - Monitoring charges for network services [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | ||
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mansey, Pradeep Parsram 1115 NW 116th Avenue Coral Springs, FL 33071 / US | 02 /
Mandalia, Baiju Dhirajlal 9501 Aegan Drive Boca Raton, FL 33496 / US | [1999/22] | Representative(s) | Davies, Simon Robert I B M UK Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | Davies, Simon Robert I B M UK Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 98309513.4 | 20.11.1998 | [1999/22] | Priority number, date | US19970979157 | 26.11.1997 Original published format: US 979157 | [1999/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0920178 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0920178 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0920178 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04M15/28, H04M3/56 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
H04M15/745 (EP,US);
H04M15/00 (EP,US);
H04M15/68 (EP,US);
H04M15/88 (EP,US);
H04M17/00 (EP,US);
H04M3/56 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0108 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0116 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0176 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1999/22] | H04M15/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL [2001/31] |
Former [1999/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gebührenüberwachung für Netzwerkdienste | [2006/24] | English: | Monitoring charges for network services | [1999/22] | French: | Surveillance des redevances pour les services de réseau de télécommunications | [1999/22] |
Former [1999/22] | Gebührensüberwachung für Netzwerkdiensten | Examination procedure | 28.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 15.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04107050 ; | [PA]JPH10164278 ; | [A]US5408519 (PIERCE GEORGE C [US], et al) [A] 3 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 62 *; | [A]WO9636159 (PROTEL INC [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * page 1, line FL - page 5, line 35 *; | [A]WO9637848 (WALKER ASSET MANAGEMENT LTD [US]) [A] 1,3,10 * page 1, line FL - page 5, line 16 *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920727), vol. 016, no. 347, Database accession no. (E - 1240), & JP04107050 A 19920408 (NEC CORP) [A] 1,8,10 * abstract * | [PA] - MANGLA A ET AL, "ENHANCING CALL-DETAIL REPORTING USING MULTIMEDIA TECHNOLOGIES", IEEE MULTIMEDIA,US,IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, (19981001), vol. 5, no. 4, ISSN 1070-986X, pages 74 - 77, XP000788441 [PA] 1,2,8,10 * page 74, line FL - page 75 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/93.735870 | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10164278 A 19980619 (NEC COMMUN SYST LTD) [PA] 1,8,10 * abstract * |