EP0919487 - Multipack [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2002 [2002/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Premium Ice Cream Company Limited Dairy Ice Creamery, Wentloog Road Cardiff CF3 8ED / GB | [1999/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thayer, Edward John 4 Bramblewood Close Thornhill, CF4 9DN, Cardiff / GB | [1999/22] | Representative(s) | Cawdell, Karen Teresa, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | Cawdell, Karen Teresa, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Three Trinity Court 21-27 Newport Road Cardiff, CF24 0AA / GB | ||
Former [2002/01] | Davies, Gregory Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road Wales Swansea, Wales SA1 5ED / GB | ||
Former [1999/22] | Austin, Hedley William Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road Swansea Wales SA1 5ED / GB | Application number, filing date | 98309591.0 | 24.11.1998 | [1999/22] | Priority number, date | GB19970024756 | 25.11.1997 Original published format: GB 9724756 | [1999/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0919487 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0919487 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | [2000/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65D71/00, B65D77/04 | [1999/22] | CPC: |
B65D77/0413 (EP);
B65D2577/043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [2000/41] |
Former [1999/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mehrstückverpackung | [1999/22] | English: | Multipack | [1999/22] | French: | Emballage pour un groupe d'articles | [1999/22] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/25] | 04.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/51] | 15.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4002005 (MUELLER MARTIN ET AL) [Y] 1-6,9,10 * column 1, line 39 - line 54; figure 2 * * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 22 * * column 10, line 31 *; | [Y]US4303153 (BOULTON GALE E) [Y] 1-6,9,10 * abstract * * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 3 * * column 3, line 58 - line 62 *; | [Y]FR2713208 (ZAGORI EVELYNE) [Y] 6 * abstract *; | [LA]US3838550 (MUELLER M) [L] 4,9 * column 2, line 2 - line 6 * * column 3, line 8 - line 11 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 48 * * column 6, line 5 - column 8, line 15 * [A] 8; | [A]US2045730 (SCHEPMAN, G.W.) [A] 1 * column 1, line 1 - line 5; figure 7 * * column 2, line 12 - line 22 *; | [A]EP0362541 (PROFOR AB) [A] 2 * abstract * * column 2, line 13 - line 15 *; | [A]US3848766 (GANTT D ET AL) [A] 6 * abstract * |