Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3742236B | Global Dossier | 01.02.2006 | B2 | JPH11242495 | 07.09.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US14978298 | 08.09.1998 | US6782297 | 05.12.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0921519 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2004 | B1 | EP0921519 | 12.04.2000 | A3 | EP0921519 | 09.06.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US14978298 | 08.09.1998 | US6782297 | 05.12.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69827586T | 01.12.2005 | T2 | DE69827586D1 | 23.12.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US14978298 | 08.09.1998 | US6782297 | 05.12.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6151574 | 21.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US14978298 | 08.09.1998 | US6782297 | 05.12.1997 |