EP0921519 - Technique for adaptation of hidden Markov Models for speech recognition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/23] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chin-Hui, Lee 44 Pheasant Run Drive Basking Ridge, New Jersey 07920 / US | 02 /
Koichi, Shinoda 3-10-7 Aoyama-dai, Abiko-shi Chiba 270-11 / JP | [1999/23] | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/23] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 98309595.1 | 24.11.1998 | [1999/23] | Priority number, date | US19970067822P | 05.12.1997 Original published format: US 67822 P | US19980149782 | 08.09.1998 Original published format: US 149782 | [1999/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0921519 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0921519 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0921519 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/06 | [2004/46] | CPC: |
G10L15/065 (EP,US);
G10L15/144 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/23] | G10L5/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/51] |
Former [1999/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Technik zur Adaptation von Hidden Markov Modellen für die Spracherkennung | [1999/23] | English: | Technique for adaptation of hidden Markov Models for speech recognition | [1999/23] | French: | Technique d'adaptation de modèles de Markov cachés pour la reconnaissance de la parole | [1999/23] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 25.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX] - SHINODA K ET AL, "Structural MAP speaker adaptation using hierarchical priors", 1997 IEEE WORKSHOP ON AUTOMATIC SPEECH RECOGNITION AND UNDERSTANDING PROCEEDINGS (CAT. NO.97TH8241), 1997 IEEE WORKSHOP ON AUTOMATIC SPEECH RECOGNITION AND UNDERSTANDING PROCEEDINGS, SANTA BARBARA, CA, USA, 14-17 DEC. 1997, 1997, New York, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, ISBN 0-7803-3698-4, pages 381 - 388, XP002130506 [PX] 1-16 * paragraph [0002] * | [X] - PAUL D B, "EXTENSIONS TO PHONE-STATE DECISION-TREE CLUSTERING: SINGLE TREE AND TAGGED CLUSTERING", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP),US,LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, (1997), ISBN 0-8186-7920-4, pages 1487 - 1490, XP000822740 [X] 1-8,11-16 * Paragraph "Tree based adaptation" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1997.596231 | [X] - MIGLIETTA C G ET AL, "Bayesian adaptation of speech recognizers to field speech data", PROCEEDINGS ICSLP 96. FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SPOKEN LANGUAGE PROCESSING (CAT. NO.96TH8206), PROCEEDING OF FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SPOKEN LANGUAGE PROCESSING. ICSLP '96, PHILADELPHIA, PA, USA, 3-6 OCT. 1996, 1996, New York, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, ISBN 0-7803-3555-4, pages 917 - 920 vol.2, XP002130507 [X] 1-8,11-16 * paragraph [0004] * | [A] - JEN-TZUNG CHIEN ET AL, "A hybrid algorithm for speaker adaptation using MAP transformation and adaptation", IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING LETTERS, JUNE 1997, IEEE, USA, vol. 4, no. 6, ISSN 1070-9908, pages 167 - 169, XP002130508 [A] 1,7 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/97.586038 |