Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0921077
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
07.02.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] |
22.03.2002 |
Change - representative |
published on 08.05.2002 [2002/19] |
15.02.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.04.2002 [2002/14] |
21.12.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.11.2001 |
Change - applicant |
published on 16.01.2002 [2002/03] |
27.11.2001 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
27.11.2001 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
19.11.2001 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
12.09.2001 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
11.07.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.04.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
05.04.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.01.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
20.12.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.08.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.04.2000 |
First examination report |
|
04.04.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
02.03.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
07.01.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 23.02.2000 [2000/08] |
05.11.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.12.1999 [1999/51] |
15.10.1999 |
Change - inventor |
published on 01.12.1999 [1999/48] |
23.04.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.06.1999 [1999/23] |