EP0921077 - Container system including a detachable collar [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Natura Cosméticos S.A. Rua Amador Bueno, 491 Sao Paulo Sao Paulo / BR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/03] | For all designated states Natura Cosméticos S.A. Rua Amador Bueno, 491 Sao Paolo, Sao Paolo / BR | ||
Former [1999/23] | For all designated states Industria e Comércio de Cosméticos Natura Ltda. Rodowia Regis Bittencourt S/N, KM 293 Itabeceria da Serra C.I.P. 06850/00, Sao Paulo / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miozzo, Maria Filomena Padron Rua Da Paz, 1313-APTO.13 CEP 04713-000-Sao Paulo-SP / BR | [1999/48] |
Former [1999/23] | 01 /
Miozzo, Maria Filomena Padron Rua Gregorio Alegre,100,Apto.43B Sao Paulo, SP / BR | Representative(s) | Darby, David Thomas, et al Abel & Imray, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | Darby, David Thomas, et al Abel & Imray, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | ||
Former [1999/23] | Lowther, Deborah Jane, et al Abel & Imray, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98309830.2 | 01.12.1998 | [1999/23] | Priority number, date | BR19979706231 | 04.12.1997 Original published format: BR 9706231 | [1999/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0921077 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0921077 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65D23/12, B65D23/10 | [1999/23] | CPC: |
B65D23/104 (EP);
B65D23/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PT [2000/08] |
Former [1999/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Behälter-Vorrichtung mit abnehmbarem Kragen | [1999/23] | English: | Container system including a detachable collar | [1999/23] | French: | Récipient muni d'une collerette amovible | [1999/23] | Examination procedure | 26.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/51] | 07.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13] | Request for further processing for: | 16.11.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 08.11.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.12.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE7836800U (HENKEL KGAA) [X] 1-4,7,8,10,13 * page 6, line 1 - page 6, line 13 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 5,6,9,11,12; | [X]US2250666 (GODEFROY) [X] 1-3,8,13 * page 1, column L, line 45 - page 1, column R, line 27 * * figures 1-7 *; | [A]GB2068886 (PLM AB) [A] 1,8 * page 2, column L, line 4 - page 2, column L, line 25 * * figures 1-4 * * page 2, column R, line 71 - page 3, column L, line 2 * | Examination | US4172533 |