Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] |
07.12.2001 | Definitive list of designations | published on 23.01.2002 [2002/04] |
18.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
17.03.2001 | Publication of search report | published on 02.05.2001 [2001/18] |
17.03.2001 | Change - classification | published on 02.05.2001 [2001/18] |
01.02.2001 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
13.08.1999 | Change - inventor | published on 29.09.1999 [1999/39] |
13.05.1999 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.06.1999 [1999/26] |