EP0926678 - Method and apparatus for compressed video segment cut-and-concatenation for editing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. Wilsonville Industrial Park 26600 S.W. Parkway Avenue Wilsonville, Oregon 97070-1000 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. Wilsonville Industrial Park, 26600 S.W. Parkway Avenue Wilsonville, Oregon 97070-1000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cen, Shanwei 14742 NW Twinflower Drive Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | 02 /
Brunner, Theodore O. 2845 N.W. Raleigh Portland, Oregon 97210 / US | [1999/39] |
Former [1999/26] | 01 /
Cen, Shanwei 875 S.W. 185th Avenue, Apt. 80 Aloha, Oregon 97006 / US | ||
02 /
Brunner, Theodore O. 2845 N.W. Raleigh Portland, Oregon 97210 / US | Representative(s) | Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al Langner Parry 1-2 Bolt Court London EC4A 3DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al Langner Parry 52-54 High Holborn London WC1V 6RR / GB | Application number, filing date | 98310040.5 | 08.12.1998 | [1999/26] | Priority number, date | US19970992684 | 17.12.1997 Original published format: US 992684 | [1999/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0926678 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0926678 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | [2001/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/031, G11B27/036, G11B27/10, H04N5/00, H04N7/26 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
G11B27/031 (EP);
G11B27/036 (EP);
H04N19/40 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/26] | G11B27/031 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/04] |
Former [1999/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zum Schneiden-und-Verknüpfen komprimierten Videosegments zur Nachbearbeitung | [1999/26] | English: | Method and apparatus for compressed video segment cut-and-concatenation for editing | [1999/26] | French: | Méthode et appareil de coupure-et-concaténation de segment vidéo comprimé pour l'édition | [1999/26] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/10] | 25.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PY]EP0855714 (SONY CORP) [PY] 1,3,4,6,7 * column 5, line 30 - column 10, line 18; figures 5-9 * * column 11, line 2 - column 12, line 25; figure 12 *; | [A]US5559562 (FERSTER WILLIAM) [A] 1,4,7 * column W *; | [A]WO9708898 (BRITISH BROADCASTING CORP ;WELLS NICHOLAS DOMINIC (GB)) [A] 1,4,7 * page 17, line 11 - page 21, line 5 *; | [Y] - HEDTKE R ET AL, "SCHNITTBEARBEITUNG VON MPEG-2-CODIERTEN VIDEOSEQUENZEN", FERNSEH UND KINOTECHNIK,VDE VERLAG GMBH. BERLIN,DE, (19960701), vol. 50, no. 7, ISSN 0015-0142, pages 367 - 373, XP000623229 [Y] 1,3,4,6,7 * the whole document * | [A] - BRIGHTWELL ET AL, "Flexible Switching and Editing of MPEG-2 Video Bitstreams", INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CONVENTION,LONDON,GB, (19970912), pages 547 - 552, XP002098561 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | [PA] - "ON CUT-EDITING TWO MPEG-2 BITSTREAMS", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE,GB,INDUSTRIAL OPPORTUNITIES LTD. HAVANT, (19980201), no. 406, ISSN 0374-4353, pages 131 - 133, XP000772307 [PA] 1-7 * the whole document * |