blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0923960

EP0923960 - Apparatus for electrical stimulation of the gastrointestinal tract [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.01.2006
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medtronic, Inc.
710 Medtronic Parkway
Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/34]For all designated states
Medtronic, Inc.
710 Medtronic Parkway
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-5604 / US
Former [2004/23]For all designated states
Medtronic Inc.
710 Medtronic Parkway
Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US
Former [1999/25]For all designated states
Medtronic Inc.
7000 Central Avenue Northeast
Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bourgeois, Ivan
Rue Jean Gome 9
4802 Verviers / BE
02 / Ryden, Johan
Maastrichtlaan 36
6191 AD Beek / NL
 [2005/09]
Former [1999/25]01 / Bourgeois, Ivan
Rue Jean gome 9
4802 Verviers / BE
02 / Ryden, Johan
Maastrichtlaan 36
6191 AD Beek / NL
Representative(s)Hughes, Andrea Michelle, et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/25]Hughes, Andrea Michelle, et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date98310233.614.12.1998
[1999/25]
Priority number, dateUS1997099098415.12.1997         Original published format: US 990984
[1999/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0923960
Date:23.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0923960
Date:02.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.03.1999
ClassificationIPC:A61N1/36
[1999/25]
CPC:
A61N1/36007 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL [2000/09]
Former [1999/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur elektrischen Reizung des Verdauungstrakts[1999/25]
English:Apparatus for electrical stimulation of the gastrointestinal tract[1999/25]
French:Appareil pour la stimulation électrique du tractus gastro-intestinal[1999/25]
Examination procedure08.09.1999Examination requested  [1999/44]
24.12.1999Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
06.04.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE
06.04.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE
02.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
22.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.10.2004Fee for grant paid
18.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08]
Request for further processing for:22.01.2004Request for further processing filed
22.01.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.02.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
19.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
31.01.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
31.01.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
31.01.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
31.01.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
31.01.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
31.01.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
31.01.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
31.01.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
31.01.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
31.01.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
31.01.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
31.01.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
31.01.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH02.03.2005
LI02.03.2005
NL02.03.2005
[2006/14]
Former [2006/12]CH02.03.2005
LI02.03.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9741921  (INNOVATIVE TECH CENTER [US]) [A] 1-10,12-22 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0571938  (CIGAINA VALERIO [IT]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9427672  (CIGAINA VALERIO [IT]) [A] 1,12 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3911930  (HAGFORS NORMAN R, et al) [A] 1,9,12 * column A *;
 [PXA]WO9848890  (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-3,9,12-14,18,19 * the whole document * [A] 4-8,10,11,15-17,20-22;
 [PA]WO9848889  (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al) [PA] 1,9,12 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.