EP0923867 - Antimicrobial compositions and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/25] | Antimicrobial composition and their use | ||
[2003/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kurita Water Industries Ltd. 4-7, Nishishinjuku 3-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states KURITA WATER INDUSTRIES LTD. 4-7, Nishishinjuku 3-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yagi, Minoru, Kurita Water Industries Ltd. 4-7 Nishishinjuku 3-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Aoki, Tetsuya, Kurita Water Industries Ltd. 4-7 Nishishinjuku 3-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 98310545.3 | 21.12.1998 | [1999/25] | Priority number, date | JP19970353181 | 22.12.1997 Original published format: JP 35318197 | [1999/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0923867 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0923867 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/80, // (A01N43/80, 25:32, 25:02) | [1999/25] | CPC: |
A01N43/80 (EP,KR,US);
A01N37/10 (KR)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/80, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/80, A01N25/32, A01N25/02 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/09] |
Former [1999/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Antimikrobielle Zusammensetzungen und ihre Verwendung | [1999/25] | English: | Antimicrobial compositions and their use | [2003/22] | French: | Compositions antimicrobiennes et leur utilisation | [1999/25] |
Former [1999/25] | Antimicrobial composition and their use | Examination procedure | 21.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 11.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH05247011 ; | [DY]JPH07330520 ; | [X]JPH03279373 ; | [PX]JPH10114761 ; | [Y]GB2201673 (KURITA WATER IND LTD) [Y] 2,9,12 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0300483 (BROMINE COMPOUNDS LTD [IL]) [X] 1-4,7,11-15,22,23 * page 4, line 38 - line 43 * * page 5, line 55 - page 6, line 2 *; | [D]JPH01190602 (KURITA WATER IND LTD); | [Y]EP0326262 (KURITA WATER IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 2,7,8,12,17,18 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0332336 (KURITA WATER IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 2,6-10,12 * the whole document *; | [D]JPH0257046B ; | [X]EP0435439 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1-6,11-16,19,22,23 * page 3, line 46 - page 4, line 35 * * page 5, line 19 - line 20 * * page 5, line 29 - line 54 *; | [D]JPH07101890 (KURITA WATER IND LTD); | [Y]EP0648415 (KURITA WATER IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 2,7,8,12,17,18 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9619465 (NIPPON SODA CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,11-16,22,23; | [X]US5534487 (GIRONDA KEVIN F [US]) [X] 1-4,11-16,22,23 * column 2, line 6 - line 22 *; | [XY]US5559083 (KUBOTA NAOKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,11-16,22,23 * column 2, line 12 - line 20 * * column 4, line 15 - line 65 * [Y] 12; | [PX]EP0816349 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [PX] 1-4,7,8,11-16,22,23 * page 3, line 23 - line 24 * * page 6, line 41 - line 48 *; | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 43, Database accession no. 93-339711, XP002099351 & JPH05247011 A 19930924 (PACHEM ASIA KK) [X] 1,3,4,11,13-16,22,23 * abstract * [Y] 2,5-10,12,17-21 | [DY] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 08, Database accession no. 96-074695, XP002099352 & JPH07330520 A 19951219 (KURITA WATER IND LTD) [DY] 2,5,6,12,19-21 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 04, Database accession no. 92-030653, XP002099353 & JPH03279373 A 19911210 (KURITA WATER IND LTD) [X] 1-4,6-8,11,13,14,22,23 * abstract * | [PX] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 98, no. 28, Database accession no. 98-316747, XP002099354 & JPH10114761 A 19980506 (TAKEDA CHEM IND LTD) [PX] 1-4,7,8,11-16,22,23 * abstract * | Examination | EP0895718 |