EP0863415 - Method and apparatus for producing a graded refractive index plastic optical fiber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City Mie 510 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | For all designated states SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, LTD. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City Mie 510 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Tetsuya, Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-City, Mie 510 / JP | [1998/37] | Representative(s) | Bertrand, Didier, et al Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Bertrand, Didier, et al S.A. Fedit-Loriot 38 Avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1999/20] | Bertrand, Didier, et al Cabinet FEDIT-LORIOT 38, Avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1999/13] | Hasenrader, Hubert, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1998/37] | Uchida, Kenji, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 98400535.5 | 06.03.1998 | [1998/37] | Priority number, date | JP19970052979 | 07.03.1997 Original published format: JP 5297997 | [1998/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0863415 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0863415 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | [1998/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/18, G02B1/04 | [1998/42] | CPC: |
G02B6/02038 (EP,US);
B29C48/05 (EP,US);
B29D11/00663 (EP,US);
B29C48/00 (EP,US);
G02B6/02033 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/37] | G02B6/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/25] |
Former [1998/37] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von optischen Fasern mit Indexgradienten aus Kunststoff | [1998/37] | English: | Method and apparatus for producing a graded refractive index plastic optical fiber | [1998/37] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication d'une fibre optique à gradient d'indice en matière plastique | [1998/37] | Examination procedure | 14.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/37] | 21.11.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH0727928 ; | [A]JPS60249103 ; | [PX]JPH09230146 ; | [A]US3999834 (OHTOMO KOICHIRO, et al) [A] 1,4,5 * abstract *;; claim 1 *; | [A]US5555525 (HO BANG C [TW], et al) [A] 1,4,5 * column 4, line 27 - line 38 *; | [A]WO9636478 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,4,5 * abstract *; page 6, line 12 - line 20 *; | [A]EP0752598 (KOIKE YASUHIRO [JP]) [A] 1,4,5 * page 7, line 23 - line 40 * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950531), vol. 095, no. 004, & JP07027928 A 19950131 (TORAY IND INC) [AD] 1,4,5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860509), vol. 010, no. 124, Database accession no. (P - 454), & JP60249103 A 19851209 (MITSUBISHI RAYON KK) [A] 1,4,5 * abstract * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 098, no. 001, & JP09230146 A 19970905 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYST LTD) [PX] 1,4,5 * abstract * |