EP0869571 - Temperature control device for a battery of electrochemical generators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [1999/08] |
Former [1998/41] | For all designated states ALCATEL ALSTHOM COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'ELECTRICITE 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flament, Pascal 161 Rue Judaique 333000 Bordeaux / FR | 02 /
Fradin, Jean 1 rue de Grange Neuve La Bruère 86240 Fontaine le Comte / FR | 03 /
Souliac, Laurent 2bis rue de la Chaume 96280 Saint Benoit / FR | 04 /
Rigobert, Gérard 189 rue Jean Mermoz 86000 Poitiers / FR | [1998/41] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | Cabinet Hirsch 34, Rue de Bassano 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/38] | Korakis-Ménager, Sophie, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Département de la Propriété Industrielle, 30, Aavenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1999/15] | Laroche, Danièle, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Département Propriété Industrielle 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1998/41] | Fournier, Michel, et al c/o ALCATEL ALSTHOM, Département de Propriété Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98400665.0 | 23.03.1998 | [1998/41] | Priority number, date | FR19970003537 | 24.03.1997 Original published format: FR 9703537 | [1998/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0869571 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0869571 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/50, H01M2/10 | [1998/41] | CPC: |
H01M10/615 (EP,US);
H01M10/613 (EP,US);
H01M10/643 (EP,US);
H01M10/6556 (EP,US);
H01M10/656 (EP,US);
H01M50/213 (EP,US);
H01M10/6567 (EP,US);
H01M50/224 (EP,US);
H01M50/271 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/24] |
Former [1998/41] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Temperaturregelungsvorrichtung für eine Batterie von elektrochemischen Generatoren | [2003/46] | English: | Temperature control device for a battery of electrochemical generators | [1998/41] | French: | Dispositif de gestion de la température d'une batterie de générateurs électrochimiques | [1998/41] |
Former [1998/41] | Temperaturregelungsvorrichtung für einen Batterie von elektrochemischen Generatoren | Examination procedure | 07.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/22] | 03.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 19.05.2004 | SE | 19.08.2004 | [2008/15] |
Former [2004/52] | SE | 19.08.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0596778 (ACCUMULATEURS FIXES [FR]) [A] 1-4* claims 1-9 *; | [A]EP0607675 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * claims 1-18 *; | [A]DE4326943 (VARTA BATTERIE [DE]) [A] 1-4 * claims 1-3 * |