EP0871182 - High data rate flat signal transmission cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexans 16, rue de Monceau 75008 Paris / FR | [2001/32] |
Former [1999/08] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1998/42] | For all designated states ALCATEL ALSTHOM COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'ELECTRICITE 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prudhon, Daniel 136 allée des Genets 08170 Fumay / FR | [1998/42] | Representative(s) | Feray, Valérie, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Feray, Valérie, et al Feray Lenne Conseil 39-41, Avenue Aristide Briand 92163 Antony Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2001/15] | Feray, Valérie, et al Cabinet FERAY/LENNE 44/52, Rue de la Justice 75020 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1998/42] | Buffiere, Michelle, et al Compagnie Financiere Alcatel, DPI, 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98400863.1 | 09.04.1998 | [1998/42] | Priority number, date | FR19970004403 | 10.04.1997 Original published format: FR 9704403 | [1998/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0871182 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0871182 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01B7/00, H01B7/08 | [1998/42] | CPC: |
H01B7/0009 (EP,US);
H01B7/0823 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, GB, IT, LI, SE [1999/25] |
Former [1998/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Signalübertragungsflachkabel mit hoher Datenrate | [1998/42] | English: | High data rate flat signal transmission cable | [1998/42] | French: | Câble plat de transmission de signaux à haut debit | [1998/42] | Examination procedure | 14.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/23] | 18.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3584132 (BRAUNS WILLIAM P, et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 43 - column 6, line 30; figures 3A-3C *; | [AD]US3663739 (CHEVRIER JEAN-CLAUDE JACQUES) [AD] 5 * column 2, line 12 - column 8, line 21; figures 1-10 * |