Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0949722
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
04.10.2002 |
Refusal of application |
published on 20.11.2002 [2002/47] |
24.07.2002 |
Application refused |
|
31.05.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
08.01.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
28.07.2001 |
Change - designated states |
published on 12.09.2001 [2001/37] |
27.07.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.04.2001 |
First examination report |
|
06.04.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
27.03.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.11.2000 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
14.08.2000 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
04.07.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
30.05.2000 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
12.05.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 28.06.2000 [2000/26] |
28.04.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.06.2000 [2000/24] |
22.03.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.08.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.10.1999 [1999/41] |