EP0949722 - Low voltage electrical connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.10.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 20.11.2002 [2002/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE ANONYME DITE: CARRIER KHEOPS BAC Boulevard Pierre Lefaucheux 72000 Le Mans / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states SOCIETE ANONYME DITE: CARRIER KHEOPS BAC Boulevard Pierre Lefaucheux 72000 Le Mans / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Perrin, Philippe 21, reu du Moulin 78610 Le Perray en Yvelines / FR | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98400876.3 | 09.04.1998 | [1999/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0949722 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01R15/12, H01R13/631 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
H01R13/631 (EP);
H01R24/28 (EP);
H01R24/76 (EP);
H01R2101/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, SE [2001/37] |
Former [2000/26] | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE | ||
Former [1999/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrischer Niederspannungsverbinder | [1999/41] | English: | Low voltage electrical connector | [1999/41] | French: | Connecteur électrique basse tension | [1999/41] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 14.04.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | 11.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/47] | 09.08.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.06.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4815986 (DHOLOO) [A] 1,2,8 * column 5, line 21 - line 46; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US3491326 (PFISTER ET AL.) [A] 1,2,5 * column 4, line 58 - column 6, line 17; figure - *; | [A]EP0657969 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEM LTD.) [A] 1,11 * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 35; figures 8,9 *; | [A]EP0054123 (MULTI-CONTACT AG BASEL) [A] 1,2,8 * page 4, paragraph L - page 7, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US5266047 (BLACK ET AL.) [A] 1,4,6 * column 7, line 49 - column 8, line 3; figure 2 * |