EP0878672 - Ventilation system with supplementary air injection for improved draught [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amphoux, André 12, rue Jules César F-75012 Paris / FR | [1998/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/47] | Representative(s) | Derambure, Christian BREESE DERAMBURE MAJEROWICZ 38, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/47] | Derambure, Christian Bouju Derambure Bugnion, 52, rue de Monceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98401132.0 | 12.05.1998 | [1998/47] | Priority number, date | FR19970005855 | 13.05.1997 Original published format: FR 9705855 | [1998/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0878672 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0878672 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F24F7/06, F24F7/08, F24F13/26 | [1998/47] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT [1999/30] |
Former [1998/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | LT | 22.05.1998 | RO | 22.05.1998 | SI | 22.05.1998 | Title | German: | Belüftungssystem mit Lufteinspritzung für einen besseren Zug | [1998/47] | English: | Ventilation system with supplementary air injection for improved draught | [1998/47] | French: | Système de ventilation avec injection d'air supplémentaire pour l'aide au tirage | [1998/47] | Examination procedure | 09.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/14] | 22.11.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 01.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 07.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 06.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 25.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.2004 | GB | 15.09.2004 | IT | 15.09.2004 | NL | 15.09.2004 | DK | 15.12.2004 | DE | 16.12.2004 | ES | 26.12.2004 | [2008/15] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
GB | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
DE | 16.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/03] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
GB | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
DE | 16.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
GB | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/27] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 15.09.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS63105345 ; | [A]JPS61159039 ; | [A]DE2748772 (FREISBERG GREGOR) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0329498 (PAZIAUD JACQUES) [A] 3,22 * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 9; figure 1 *; | [XA]WO9508084 (P O ANDERSSON KONSTRUKTIONSBYR [SE], et al) [X] 1,44 * the whole document * [A] 2,45 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880916), vol. 012, no. 346, Database accession no. (M - 742), & JP63105345 A 19880510 (SUSUMU NAKAYAMA) [A] 22 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861206), vol. 010, no. 365, Database accession no. (M - 542), & JP61159039 A 19860718 (KAJIMA CORP) [A] 3 * abstract * | Examination | US3347147 | - European Standard EN 13141-5 Ventilation for buildings Performance testing of components/products for residential ventilation Part 5: Cowls and roof outlet terminal devices | - Norme française P50-413 Ventilation Conduits de ventilation naturelle et conduits de fumée Code d'essai et classement des extracteurs statiques |