EP0961262 - Problem-solving using an improved constraint satisfaction problem formulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony France S.A. 20-26 rue Morel 92110 Clichy La Garenne / FR | [2002/01] |
Former [1999/48] | For all designated states Sony France S.A. 15, Rue Floréal 75831 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pachet, Francois Sony Computer Science Laboratory, 6, rue Amyot 75005 Paris / FR | 02 /
Roy, Pierre 83, rue du Cardinal Lemoine 75005 Paris / FR | [1999/48] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 98401268.2 | 27.05.1998 | [1999/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0961262 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G10H1/00 | [1999/48] | CPC: |
G10H1/00 (EP);
G06N5/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/32] |
Former [1999/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Problemlösung durch eine verbesserte Formulierung von Zwangsbedingungserfüllungsproblemen | [1999/48] | English: | Problem-solving using an improved constraint satisfaction problem formulation | [1999/48] | French: | Solution de problèmes utilisant une formulation améliorée des problèmes de satisfaction de contrainte | [1999/48] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 03.06.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 07.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/06] | 30.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.06.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.06.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - GENSEL J ET AL, INTEGRATING CONSTRAINTS, COMPOSITE OBJECTS AND TASKS IN A KNOWLEDGEREPRESENTATION SYSTEM, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TOOLS WITH ARTIFICIA INTELLIGENCE (TAI), BOSTON, NOV. 8 - 11, 1993, NR. CONF. 5, PAGE(S) 127 - 130, (19931108), XP000436433 [X] 1-10 * page 128, column L, line 15 - page 129, column L, line 36 * | [DA] - HENZ M ET AL, COMPOZE - INTENTION-BASED MUSIC COMPOSITION THROUGH CONSTRAINT PROGRAMMING, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, PROCEEDINGS OF THE EIGHTH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TOOLS WITH ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE, TOULOUSE, NOV. 16 - 19, 1996, NR. CONF. 8, PAGE(S) 118 - 121, (19961116), XP000687720 [DA] 5,10 * page 118, column R, line 30 - page 119, column L, line 13 * * page 119, column R, line 37 - page 120, column L, line 12 * |