EP0884088 - Method for the separation of a gas mixture by pressure swing adsorption [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/51] | Installation and method for the separation of a gas mixture by pressure swing adsorption | ||
[2005/45] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1998/51] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petit, Pierre 13, rue d'Amblainvilliers 91370 Verrieres-Le-Buisson / FR | 02 /
Andreani, Philippe 2280 Melrose, Montréal Québec H4A 2R8 / CA | 03 /
Monereau, Christian 159, rue de Charonne 75011 Paris / FR | [1998/51] | Representative(s) | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al Societé l'Air Liquide Service Brevets et Marques 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al Societé l'Air Liquide Service Brevets et Marques 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 98401364.9 | 08.06.1998 | [1998/51] | Priority number, date | FR19970007117 | 09.06.1997 Original published format: FR 9707117 | [1998/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0884088 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/053, B01D53/047 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
B01D53/047 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40003 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40007 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40052 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40062 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40064 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, IT, NL [1999/34] |
Former [1998/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Trennung eines Gasgemisches mittels Druckwechseladsorption | [2005/45] | English: | Method for the separation of a gas mixture by pressure swing adsorption | [2005/45] | French: | Procédé de séparation d'un mélange gazeux par adsorption à variation de pression | [2005/45] |
Former [1998/51] | Anlage und Verfahren zur Trennung eines Gasgemisches mittels Druckwechseladsorption | ||
Former [1998/51] | Installation and method for the separation of a gas mixture by pressure swing adsorption | ||
Former [1998/51] | Dispositif et procédé de séparation d'un mélange gazeux par adsorption à variation de pression | Examination procedure | 16.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/33] | 08.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/25] | 02.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/25] | Request for further processing for: | 07.10.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 07.10.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.10.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3788036 (STAHL D, et al) [X] 1-3 * column 7, line 4 - line 62; figure 4; claim 14 * [Y] 4,5,7,8; | [YA]EP0537831 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [Y] 4,5,7,8 * page 1, line 45 - page 2, line 5; figures 1,4 * [A] 1-3,6; | [AD]US4892566 (BANSAL RAVINDER K [US], et al) [AD] 2,3 * column 5, line 2 - line 10; figure 1 *; | [AD]US4948391 (NOGUCHI YUTAKA [JP]) [AD] 1-8 * column 12, line 59 - column 13, line 52; figure 11 * |