EP0893205 - Washer strip carrying fasteners and fastener-driving tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.2004 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.01.2005 [2005/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DE PROSPECTION ET D'INVENTIONS TECHNIQUES SPIT Route de Lyon 26501 Bourg-Les-Valence Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states SOCIETE DE PROSPECTION ET D'INVENTIONS TECHNIQUES SPIT Route de Lyon 26501 Bourg-Les-Valence Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1999/04] | For all designated states SOCIETE DE PROSPECTION ET D'INVENTIONS TECHNIQUES SPIT Route de Lyon F-26501 Bourg-Les-Valence Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Almeras, Roland 15 rue du Général Chapelle 07300 Tournon / FR | 02 /
Herelier, Patrick Le Vigneau 1 Lotissement les Prés Saint Jean de Muzols 07300 Tournon / FR | [1999/04] | Representative(s) | Bloch, Gérard Gevers France 41, Avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/04] | Bloch, Gérard 2, square de l'Avenue du Bois 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98401396.1 | 10.06.1998 | [1999/04] | Priority number, date | FR19970009493 | 25.07.1997 Original published format: FR 9709493 | [1999/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0893205 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0893205 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B25C1/18, B25C1/00 | [1999/04] | CPC: |
F16B15/08 (EP);
B25C1/184 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/40] |
Former [1999/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ringstreifen zum Halten von Befestigungsdübeln und Setzgerät dafür | [1999/04] | English: | Washer strip carrying fasteners and fastener-driving tool | [1999/04] | French: | Bande de bagues de réception de tampon de scellement pour appareil de scellement de tampon | [1999/04] | Examination procedure | 07.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/35] | 10.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 04.02.2004 | [2005/01] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2111359 (OMARK INDUSTRIES INC) [A] 1 * figures 3,4,7 *; | [X]FR2158865 (INZOLI GIOVANNI, et al) [X] 1 * page 6, line 2 - line 9; figures 24-29 *; | [A]DE2314920 (RAPID BEFESTIGUNGSTECH GMBH)[A] 1; | [A]FR2628021 (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 1 |