EP0890387 - Process for the separation of a gas mixture with pressure swing adsorption [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1999/02] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petit, Pierre 13, rue d'Amblainvilliers 91370 Verrieres le Buisson / FR | [1999/02] | Representative(s) | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al Societé l'Air Liquide Service Brevets et Marques 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/02] | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al Societé l'Air Liquide Service Brevets et Marques 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 98401552.9 | 24.06.1998 | [1999/02] | Priority number, date | FR19970008724 | 09.07.1997 Original published format: FR 9708724 | [1999/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0890387 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0890387 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/053, B01D53/047 | [1999/02] | CPC: |
B01D53/0476 (EP,US);
B01D53/0473 (EP,US);
B01D53/053 (EP,US);
B01D2253/108 (EP,US);
B01D2256/12 (EP,US);
B01D2257/102 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40016 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40022 (EP,US);
B01D2259/4003 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40052 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40056 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40069 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT, NL, SE [1999/38] |
Former [1999/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren für die Trennung einer Gasmischung mittels Druckwechseladsorption | [1999/02] | English: | Process for the separation of a gas mixture with pressure swing adsorption | [1999/02] | French: | Procédé de séparation d'un mélange gazeux par adsorption à variation de pression | [1999/02] | Examination procedure | 13.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/36] | 05.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 20.08.2003 | NL | 20.08.2003 | SE | 20.11.2003 | ES | 01.12.2003 | [2008/15] |
Former [2004/46] | NL | 20.08.2003 | |
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
ES | 01.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | NL | 20.08.2003 | |
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | NL | 20.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0821992 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [PX] 1-6,11-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US5565018 (BAKSH MOHAMED S A [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 8, line 53 - column 9, line 30; figure 4 *; | [AD]EP0743087 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0689862 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [A] 1-14 * column 5, line 2 - line 48; figure 2 * |