EP0896456 - Pulse shaping for the control of the amplitude variation of PSK signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTEL NETWORKS France Parc d'activités de Magny-Châteaufort 78117 Châteaufort / FR | [2002/27] |
Former [1999/06] | For all designated states MATRA NORTEL COMMUNICATIONS 50, rue du Président Sadate 29000 Quimper / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marque-Pucheu, Gérard 29A, rue Chanzy 75011 Paris / FR | 02 /
Roseiro, Albert 40 Terrasse de l'Iris 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [1999/06] | Representative(s) | Loisel, Bertrand Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/06] | Loisel, Bertrand Cabinet Plasseraud, 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 98401972.9 | 03.08.1998 | [1999/06] | Priority number, date | FR19970009962 | 04.08.1997 Original published format: FR 9709962 | [1999/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0896456 | Date: | 10.02.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0896456 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/20, H04L25/03 | [1999/06] | CPC: |
H04L27/2071 (EP);
H04L25/03834 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, PT [1999/42] |
Former [1999/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | LT | 08.01.1999 | LV | 08.01.1999 | RO | 08.01.1999 | SI | 08.01.1999 | Title | German: | Pulsformung für die Kontrolle von Amplitudenvariationen von PSK-Signalen | [2004/01] | English: | Pulse shaping for the control of the amplitude variation of PSK signals | [1999/06] | French: | Mise en forme d'impulsions pour le réglage de variation en amplitude de signaux MDF | [1999/06] |
Former [1999/06] | Pulsformung für die Kontrolle von Amplitudenvariationen PSK-Signale | Examination procedure | 08.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/10] | 05.02.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, FI, LU, MC, NL, SE | 18.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP99102638.6 / EP0936784 | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.09.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.04.2004 | IE | 28.04.2004 | IT | 28.04.2004 | GR | 28.07.2004 | ES | 08.08.2004 | BE | 31.08.2004 | CH | 31.08.2004 | LI | 31.08.2004 | PT | 28.09.2004 | [2008/15] |
Former [2005/51] | AT | 28.04.2004 | |
IE | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
BE | 31.08.2004 | ||
CH | 31.08.2004 | ||
LI | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/25] | AT | 28.04.2004 | |
IE | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
CH | 31.08.2004 | ||
LI | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | AT | 28.04.2004 | |
IE | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 28.04.2004 | |
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | GR | 28.07.2004 | |
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | ES | 08.08.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0494696 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,5 * figures 1,6 * * page 4, line 29 - line 38 * * page 7, line 6 - line 14 *; | [A]FR2675001 (MATRA COMMUNICATION [FR]) [A] 1-9 * page 2, line 11 - line 14 * * page 3, line 6 - line 9 * * page 3, line 15 - line 20 * * page 4, line 4 - line 16 * * page 4, line 21 - line 23 * * page 4, line 33 *; | [A]EP0633681 (ERICSSON GE MOBILE COMMUNICAT [US]) [A] 1,5 * abstract * * page 4, line 11 - line 15 * * page 5, line 15 - line 25 * * page 3, line 3 - line 7 *; | [A]EP0633680 (ERICSSON GE MOBILE COMMUNICAT [US]) [A] 1,5 * page 3, line 9 - line 13 ** page 5, line 3 - line 7 * |