EP0911182 - Folding and inserting apparatus with optimized mailpieces paths [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEOPOST INDUSTRIE 113 rue Jean-Marin Naudin 92220 Bagneux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states NEOPOST INDUSTRIE 113 rue Jean-Marin Naudin F-92220 Bagneux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernard, Emmanuel 7, Square Jules Ferry 95110 Sannois / FR | 02 /
Mazeiller, Dominique 49, rue du Tertre 95530 La Frette / FR | [1999/17] | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 98402223.6 | 09.09.1998 | [1999/17] | Priority number, date | FR19970013053 | 17.10.1997 Original published format: FR 9713053 | [1999/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0911182 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0911182 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B43M5/04 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
B43M5/042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2000/02] |
Former [1999/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kuvertiermaschine mit optimisierten Wegen für die Dokumente | [1999/17] | English: | Folding and inserting apparatus with optimized mailpieces paths | [1999/17] | French: | Plieuse/inséreuse à chemins de documents optimisés | [1999/17] | Examination procedure | 08.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/44] | 11.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0352692 (ALCATEL SATMAM [FR]) [AD] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0700794 (PITNEY BOWES PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 35 - line 59 * * column 6, line 35 - column 7, line 4 *; | [A]WO9728972 (PRINSERTER CORP [BS], et al) [A] 1* claim 1 * | by applicant | EP0352292 |