blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0986218

EP0986218 - A shaping method, a shaper realizing such a shaping method and a communication network including such a shaper [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  07.07.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 12.11.2008  [2008/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
54, rue la Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2007/17]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
54 rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2000/11]For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Bonaventure, Oliver
Avenue de la Charmille 16, bte. 48
1200 Woluwe-Saint-Lambert / BE
[2000/11]
Representative(s)Narmon, Gisèle Marie Thérèse, et al
Alcatel-Lucent Bell N.V.
Intellectual Property Department
Copernicuslaan 50
2018 Antwerpen / BE
[N/P]
Former [2008/46]Narmon, Gisèle Marie Thérèse, et al
Alcatel Bell N.V. Intellectual Property Department Copernicuslaan 50
2018 Antwerpen / BE
Former [2000/11]Narmon, Gisèle Marie Thérèse, et al
Alcatel Bell N.V. Intellectual Property Department Francis Wellesplein 1
2018 Antwerpen / BE
Application number, filing date98402245.911.09.1998
[2000/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0986218
Date:15.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.03.1999
ClassificationIPC:H04L12/56, H04Q11/04
[2000/11]
CPC:
H04L12/5602 (EP,US); H04Q11/0478 (EP,US); H04L2012/5632 (EP,US);
H04L2012/568 (EP,US); H04L2012/5684 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/47]
Former [2000/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verkehrsformungsverfahren, Anlage zur Durchführung des Verfahrens und Kommunikationsnetzwerk mit einer solchen Anlage[2000/11]
English:A shaping method, a shaper realizing such a shaping method and a communication network including such a shaper[2000/11]
French:Méthode de mise en forme, dispositif pour sa réalisation et réseau de communication avec un tel dispositif[2000/11]
Examination procedure15.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
01.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.07.2007Application withdrawn by applicant  [2007/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
22.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
07.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
15.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
14.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]  - KYEONG SOO KIM ET AL, "THREE-LEVEL TRAFFIC SHAPER AND ITS APPLICATION TO SOURCE CLOCK FREQUENCY RECOVERY FOR VBR VIDEO SERVICES IN ATM NETWORKS", IEEE / ACM TRANSACTIONS ON NETWORKING, (19950801), vol. 3, no. 4, pages 450 - 458, XP000520864 [X] 1,2,4,5,9,10 * page 450, column R, line 40 - line 45 * * page 451, column L, line 36 - column R, line 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/90.413219
 [A]  - MEHRVAR H R ET AL, "ON PREDICTION OF BURSTY TRAFFIC IN BROADBAND SATCOM SYSTEMS", 1996 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (ICC), CONVERGING TECHNOLOGIES FOR TOMORROW'S APPLICATIONS DALLAS, JUNE 23 - 27, 1996, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL & ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19960623), vol. 2, pages 926 - 930, XP000625909 [A] 1,2,4,5,9,10 * page 926, column L, line 1 - page 927, column L, line 10 *
 [A]  - RITTER M, "PERFORMANCE ANALYSIS OF THE DUAL CELL SPACER IN ATM SYSTEMS", HIGH PERFORMANCE NETWORKING 6, IFIP 6TH. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON HIGH PERFORMANCE NETWORKING (HPN). PALMA DE MALLORCA, SEPT. 13 - 15, 1995, PUIGJANER R (ED ), (19950911), no. CONF. 6, pages 345 - 362, XP000624348 [A] 1,3,7 * page 346, line 1 - page 347, line 8 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.