EP0907284 - Charge coupled photosensitive device with charge accumulation and Lidar incorporating such a device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astrium SAS 37, avenue Louis Bréguet 78140 Velizy-Villacoublay / FR | [2000/48] |
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states MATRA MARCONI SPACE FRANCE 4, rue de Presbourg 75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tulet, Michel 7 rue de Jemmapes 31130 Balma / FR | 02 /
Fabre, Frédéric 20 rue Saint-Henri 31000 Toulouse / FR | 03 /
Morancais, Didier 14 rue Beaumarchais 31850 Beaupuy / FR | [1999/14] | Representative(s) | Loisel, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | Loisel, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Plasseraud, 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1999/14] | Fort, Jacques CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 98402418.2 | 01.10.1998 | [1999/14] | Priority number, date | FR19970012340 | 03.10.1997 Original published format: FR 9712340 | [1999/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0907284 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0907284 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/15, G01J3/28 | [1999/14] | CPC: |
G01J3/2803 (EP,US);
H04N25/715 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1999/51] |
Former [1999/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Lichtempfindliche ladungsgekoppelte Vorrichtung mit Ladungsakkumulation und Lidar mit einer solchen Vorrichtung | [1999/14] | English: | Charge coupled photosensitive device with charge accumulation and Lidar incorporating such a device | [1999/14] | French: | Dispositif photosensible à couplage et accumulation de charges et lidar incorporant un tel dispositif | [1999/14] | Examination procedure | 04.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 07.10.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 04.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.11.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.11.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0438335 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [A]US5166800 (MORI TAKESHI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0516543 (MATRA MARCONI SPACE FRANCE [FR]); | [DY]FR2735935 (MATRA MARCONI SPACE FRANCE [FR]) |