EP0908369 - Motorisation assembly for switching points [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEC ALSTHOM TRANSPORT SA 38, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | [1999/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carmes, Francis 3 Villa Séverine 78960 Voisins le Bretonneux / FR | [1999/15] | Representative(s) | Gosse, Michel, et al ALSTOM Intellectual Property Department 25 Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Gosse, Michel, et al ALSTOM Intellectual Property Department 25 Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1999/15] | Gosse, Michel, et al ALSTOM France SA Service de Propriété Industrielle c/o CEGELEC 5, Avenue Newton 92142 Clamart Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 98402467.9 | 06.10.1998 | [1999/15] | Priority number, date | FR19970012509 | 07.10.1997 Original published format: FR 9712509 | [1999/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0908369 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0908369 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B61L5/10, B61L5/06 | [1999/15] | CPC: |
B61L5/06 (EP);
B61L5/107 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/15] | Extension states | AL | 14.10.1999 | LT | 14.10.1999 | LV | 14.10.1999 | MK | 14.10.1999 | RO | 14.10.1999 | SI | 14.10.1999 | Title | German: | Motorgetriebe zur Steuerung einer Weiche | [1999/15] | English: | Motorisation assembly for switching points | [1999/15] | French: | Ensemble de motorisation pour la manoeuvre d'un aiguillage | [1999/15] | Examination procedure | 14.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/52] | 25.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2394712 (BROWN SADI SA DAVID [BE]) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0317927 (ALSTHOM [FR]) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9417594 (COCKERILL SAMBRE SA [BE], et al) [Y] 4* claim - * |