EP0910967 - Applicator for hair care products and container equiped therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baudin, Gilles 11, Rue de l'Ouest 95330 Domont / FR | 02 /
Vieu, Valérie 29, Rue Davioud 75016 Paris / FR | [1999/17] | Representative(s) | Boulard, Denis L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | Boulard, Denis L'OREAL-DPI 6 rue Bertrand Sincholle 92585 Clichy Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 98402474.5 | 06.10.1998 | [1999/17] | Priority number, date | FR19970013448 | 27.10.1997 Original published format: FR 9713448 | [1999/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0910967 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A45D19/02 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
A46B11/0041 (EP,US);
A45D19/0083 (EP,US);
A45D19/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/02] |
Former [1999/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Auftragsvorrichtung für Haarpflegeprodukte und damit ausgerüsteter Behälter | [1999/17] | English: | Applicator for hair care products and container equiped therewith | [1999/17] | French: | Dispositif applicateur de produit capillaire et récipient équipé d'un tel dispositif | [1999/17] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/52] | 07.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/44] | 13.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE211282 (F. MEYER); | [A]FR948576 (J.A. VOSS) [A] 1,7,8,14,19 * page 2, line 91 - line 103; figures 1,2,5 *; | [DA]US2865383 (MCDOUGALL KALEY FLORA) [DA] 1-3,5,6,8,10,20,25-29 * column 1, line 15 - column 2, line 6 * * column 3, line 7 - line 45; figures 1-4,8 *; | [DA]US4211247 (MORGANROTH SHILA [US]) [DA] 1-3,5,6,9,25-29 * column 16, line 39 - line 43; figure 39 * * column 8, line 14 - column 9, line 29; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]FR2482431 (FUHS HANS [DE]) [DA] 1,9-11,17,18 * page 7, line 13 - page 8, line 2; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0110277 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1,8,23,24 * abstract * | by applicant | US2865383 | US4209027 | US4211247 | FR2482431 |