EP0922620 - Procedure for storage and removal from storage of cabins within the stations of an aerial cable railway installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2011 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POMAGALSKI S.A. 11, rue René Camphin 38600 Fontaine / FR | [1999/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tarassoff, Serge 2 Place de l'Etoile 38000 Grenoble / FR | 02 /
Vibert, Gilles Rue du Vercors 38500 Coublevie / FR | [1999/33] |
Former [1999/24] | 01 /
Tarassoff, Serge 9 rue Laurent Darves 38170 Seyssinet-Pariset / FR | ||
02 /
Vibert, Gilles Rue du Vercors 38500 Coublevie / FR | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/20] | Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1999/24] | Derambure, Christian Bouju Derambure Bugnion, 52, rue de Monceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98403053.6 | 04.12.1998 | [1999/24] | Priority number, date | FR19970015635 | 10.12.1997 Original published format: FR 9715635 | [1999/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0922620 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0922620 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/09] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0922620 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B61B12/02 | [1999/24] | CPC: |
B61B12/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, ES, FR, IT, LI [2000/08] |
Former [1999/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Abstellen und wieder in Umlauf bringen von Kabinen in den Stationen einer Seilschwebebahn - Anlage | [1999/24] | English: | Procedure for storage and removal from storage of cabins within the stations of an aerial cable railway installation | [1999/24] | French: | Procédé de stockage et déstockage de cabines dans les gares d'une installation de transport à cable aérien | [1999/24] | Examination procedure | 10.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 28.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.10.2004
03.11.2004
ADMISSIBLE Innova Patent GmbH Rickenbacherstrasse 8-10 6960 Wolfurt / AT Opponent's representative Hehenberger, Reinhard BEER & PARTNER PATENTANWÄLTE KG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.10.2004
03.11.2004
ADMISSIBLE Innova Patent GmbH Rickenbacherstrasse 8-10 6960 Wolfurt / AT Opponent's representative Hehenberger, Reinhard Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Manfred Beer Dipl.-Ing. Reinhard Hehenberger Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2004/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.10.2004
Innova Patent GmbH Rickenbacherstrasse 8-10 6960 Wolfurt / AT Opponent's representative Atzwanger, Richard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Mariahilfer Strasse 1c 1060 Wien / AT | 04.01.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 18.05.2010 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.05.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.07.2010 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.07.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 04.02.2011 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   11.03.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2011/32] |
Former [2011/28] | IT | 04.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2583363 (POMAGALSKI SA [FR]) [A] 1,2,5,6,12* page 4, line 31 - page 6, line 13; figures 1-6 *; | [A]FR2605574 (CREISSELS DENIS SA [FR]) [A] 1,2,5,6,12 * page 3, line 30 - page 6, paragraph 2; figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP0557179 (SOULE SA [FR]) [A] 1,2,5,6,12 * column 11, line 51 - column 13, line 21; figures 2,3 * | by applicant | FR2598373 | EP0369981 | FR2654052 |