EP0928871 - Improvement of the hinging of a wing on a fixed frame. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferco International Ferrures et Serrures de Bâtiment 2, rue du Vieux Moulin 57445 Réding / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states Ferco International Ferrures et Serrures de Bâtiment 2, rue du Vieux Moulin 57445 Réding / FR | ||
Former [1999/28] | For all designated states Ferco International Ferrures et Serrures de Bâtiment 2, rue du Vieux Moulin 57400 Réding / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prevot, Gérard 39, rue de Herbitzheim 57430 Willerwald / FR | 02 /
Mih, Philippe 14, rue Georges Clémenceau 57430 Sarralbe / FR | [1999/28] | Representative(s) | Keib, Gérard, et al Novagraaf Technologies SA 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/28] | Keib, Gérard, et al NOVAMARK TECHNOLOGIES Anciennement Brevets Rodhain & Porte 122, Rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 98403288.8 | 23.12.1998 | [1999/28] | Priority number, date | FR19980000089 | 07.01.1998 Original published format: FR 9800089 | [1999/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0928871 | Date: | 14.07.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0928871 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E05D7/10 | [1999/28] | CPC: |
E05D7/1022 (EP);
E05D5/128 (EP);
E05D2005/145 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT [2000/12] |
Former [1999/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbesserung der gelenkigen Verbindung eines Flügels an einem Rahmen | [1999/28] | English: | Improvement of the hinging of a wing on a fixed frame. | [1999/28] | French: | Perfectionnement d'articulation d'un ouvrant sur un dormant | [1999/28] | Examination procedure | 30.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/50] | 02.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 18.09.2002 | [2008/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2623140 (VER BAUBESCHLAG GRETSCH CO) [A] 1-5 * page 8, paragraph 8 - page 9, line 4 * * page 11, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4; figures 1,6-8 *; | [A]DE8805504U (GRETSCH-UNITAS) [A] 1-3 * page 12, paragraph 3 - page 14, paragraph 2; figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE9016894U (CARL FUHR) [A] 1-3 * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 1 ** page 6, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 1; figures 1-6 * |