EP0925983 - Air flow control device and arrangement of this device in the front part of an automotive vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECIA - EQUIPEMENTS ET COMPOSANTS POUR L'INDUSTRIE AUTOMOBILE F-25400 Audincourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states ECIA - EQUIPEMENTS ET COMPOSANTS POUR L'INDUSTRIE AUTOMOBILE F-25400 Audincourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lucbernet, Bruno 23, rue des Sources 25230 Seloncourt / FR | 02 /
Tourret, Alain 52, rue de la Beuse aux Loups 25200 Monbeliard / FR | [1999/26] | Representative(s) | Moncheny, Michel, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | Moncheny, Michel, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2 Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1999/26] | de la Bigne, Guillaume Michel Marie, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix, 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 98403290.4 | 23.12.1998 | [1999/26] | Priority number, date | FR19970016526 | 24.12.1997 Original published format: FR 9716526 | [1999/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0925983 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60K11/08, F24F13/15, F01P7/10, E06B7/086 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
E06B7/086 (EP);
B60K11/085 (EP);
F01P7/10 (EP);
F24F13/15 (EP);
B60Y2410/113 (EP);
Y02T10/88 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2000/10] |
Former [1999/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Steuerung eines Luftstromes und Anordnung dieser Vorrichtung im Frontteil eines Kraftfahrzeuges | [1999/26] | English: | Air flow control device and arrangement of this device in the front part of an automotive vehicle | [1999/26] | French: | Dispositif de pilotage d'un flux d'air et agencement de ce dispositif dans un bloc avant de véhicule automobile | [1999/26] | Examination procedure | 10.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/27] | 31.12.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 26.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.01.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3605064 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [A] 1,3,4,11,12 * page 3, line 47 - page 5, line 19; figure - *; | [A]GB2194329 (GRADWOOD LIMITED) [A] 1,3,4,8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0605325 (VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR SA [FR]) [A] 1,11,12 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 7; figure 1 *; | [A]US4753288 (HARVEY WILLIAM O [US]) [A] 1,4,9,11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0308601 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE], et al) [A] 1,8 * figures 1,4 *; | [DA]DE3836374 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]); | [DA]EP0421098 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) | by applicant | DE3836374 | EP0421098 | DE3605064 |