EP0863546 - Pseudo-fuse and its use in a circuit for setting a bistable flip-flop [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DE, IT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.A. 29, Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2001/51] |
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.A. 7, Avenue Galliéni 94250 Gentilly / FR | ||
Former [1998/37] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.A. 7, Avenue Galliéni 94250 Gentilly / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kalnitsky, Alexander 2601 43rd Avenue, Apartment 204 San Francisco, CA 94116 / US | 02 /
Ferrant, Richard 45, Allée de Prapoutel 38330 Saint Ismier / FR | [1998/37] | Representative(s) | de Beaumont, Michel 1, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | [1998/37] | Application number, filing date | 98410025.5 | 03.03.1998 | [1998/37] | Priority number, date | FR19970002951 | 07.03.1997 Original published format: FR 9702951 | [1998/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0863546 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0863546 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/768, H01L23/525, H01L27/11 | [1998/37] | CPC: |
H01L23/5256 (EP);
H01L21/76888 (EP);
G11C17/16 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/21] |
Former [1998/37] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Pseudoschmelzsicherung und ihre Anwendung bei einer Schaltung zum Setzen eines bistabilen Flip-Flop | [1998/37] | English: | Pseudo-fuse and its use in a circuit for setting a bistable flip-flop | [1998/37] | French: | Pseudofusible et application à un circuit d'établissement d'une bascule à la mise sous tension | [1998/37] | Examination procedure | 17.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/15] | 25.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 06.09.2006 | IT | 06.09.2006 | DE | 07.12.2006 | [2008/15] |
Former [2007/29] | GB | 06.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4022398 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]DE4005851 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]WO9303500 (SIERRA SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]); | [A]US5493147 (HOLZWORTH MONTA R [US], et al); | [PX]WO9712401 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) |