EP0860112 - Watertight fishing reel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITCHELL SPORTS 396 rue de la Précision, ZI des Prés Paris 74970 Marignier / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states Mitchell Sports 396 rue de la Précision, ZI des Prés Paris 74970 Marignier / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernard, Jean 134 avenue des Lacs 74950 Scionzier / FR | 02 /
Plestan, Alain 131 Impasse des Merises 74970 Marignier / FR | [1998/47] |
Former [1998/35] | 01 /
Bernard, Jean 134 avenue des Lacs 74950 Scionzier / FR | ||
02 /
Plestan, Alian 131 Impasse des Merises 74970 Marignier / FR | Representative(s) | Poncet, Jean-François Cabinet Poncet 7, chemin de Tillier B.P. 317 74008 Annecy Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | Poncet, Jean-François Cabinet Poncet, 7, chemin de Tillier, B.P. 317 74008 Annecy Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 98420029.5 | 16.02.1998 | [1998/35] | Priority number, date | FR19970002135 | 17.02.1997 Original published format: FR 9702135 | [1998/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0860112 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0860112 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A01K89/01 | [1998/35] | CPC: |
A01K89/011221 (EP,US);
A01K89/01 (EP);
A01K89/01127 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB, IT [1999/19] |
Former [1998/35] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wasserdichte Angelrolle | [1998/35] | English: | Watertight fishing reel | [1998/35] | French: | Moulinet étanche | [1998/35] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/53] | 12.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5203104 (BRAUER AAARON A [US]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]FR2701812 (CALVET JEAN [FR]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5328127 (YOSHIKAWA OSAMU [JP]) [A] 10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5156351 (CITTADINI DANIEL [FR]); | [A]US4911378 (HITOMI YASUHIRO [JP]) [A] 10 * the whole document *; | [A]US4852826 (SATO JUN [JP]); | [A]US4813629 (HASHIMOTO HIROSHI [JP], et al) |