EP0874347 - Device for the visual identification of the condition of a wood construction, particularly a post, after a quality-control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2003 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sandoz, Jean-Luc Chemin de la Brume 4, Appartement 76 1110 Morges / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/44] | For all designated states Sandoz, Jean-Luc Chemin de la Brume 4, Appartement 76 1110 Morges / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/44] | Representative(s) | Dupuis, François, et al Cabinet Laurent et Charras 20 Rue Louis Chirpaz B.P. 32 69131 Ecully Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Dupuis, François, et al Cabinet Laurent et Charras 20 Rue Louis Chirpaz B.P. 32 69131 Ecully Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1998/49] | Dupuis, François, et al Cabinet Laurent et Charras, B.P. 32 69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1998/44] | Laurent, Michel, et al Cabinet LAURENT et CHARRAS, 20, rue Louis Chirpaz B.P. 32 69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 98420052.7 | 24.03.1998 | [1998/44] | Priority number, date | FR19970005427 | 25.04.1997 Original published format: FR 9705427 | [1998/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0874347 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0874347 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/12 | [1998/44] | CPC: |
G09F3/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1999/27] |
Former [1998/44] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur visuellen Identifizierung des Zustandes einer Holzstruktur, insbesondere eines Pfosten, nach Qualitätskontrolle | [1998/44] | English: | Device for the visual identification of the condition of a wood construction, particularly a post, after a quality-control | [1998/44] | French: | Dispositif permettant l'indentification visuelle de l'état d'une structure en bois, poteau notamment, après un contrôle de qualité | [1998/44] | Examination procedure | 22.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/25] | 29.04.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 20.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.05.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.05.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 06.03.2002 | [2003/01] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1759354U (G.RUCKELSHAUSEN) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1470274 (SETON NAME PLATE) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * |