EP0908130 - Toaster with a means to select between two bread discharging positions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.2003 [2003/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/15] | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Houel, Jean-Pierre 34, Grande Rue 88120 Saint Ame / FR | [2002/21] |
Former [1999/15] | 01 /
Houel, Jean-Pierre 34, Grande Rue 88120 Saint ame / FR | Application number, filing date | 98420170.7 | 01.10.1998 | [1999/15] | Priority number, date | FR19970012731 | 07.10.1997 Original published format: FR 9712731 | [1999/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0908130 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/08 | [1999/15] | CPC: |
A47J37/0814 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1999/52] |
Former [1999/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Brotröster mit einem Selektionsmechanismus für zwei Brot-Auswerfpositionen | [1999/15] | English: | Toaster with a means to select between two bread discharging positions | [1999/15] | French: | Grille-pain avec moyen de selection entre deux positions de dechargement du pain | [1999/15] | Examination procedure | 07.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 15.10.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 09.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/22] | 20.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.11.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.11.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US2330644 (UHLRIG HARRY W); | [A]FR2464046 (NUOVA FEDER SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 4 - page 3, line 34; figure - *; | [A]DE9014527U (G.E.W. CORP. LTD) [A] 1 * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 8, paragraph 2; figure - *; | [A]EP0450457 (BRAUN AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 46 - column 11, line 9; figure - *; | [DA]FR2729285 (MOULINEX SA [FR]) [DA] 1 * page 5, line 8 - page 8, line 10; figure - * | by applicant | US2330644 | FR2729285 |