Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP0928769

Designated contracting states BE 
 DE 
 ES 
 IT 
Examination procedure09.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
20.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
10.02.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
European patent granted19.05.2004
Opposition procedure22.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit published on 04.05.2005 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:18.12.2002 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20021106
 
Event date:14.07.1999 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):BE DE ES IT
 
Event date:14.07.1999 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:01.12.1999 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19991004
 
Event date:22.03.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:BE DE ES IT
 
Event date:19.05.2004 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):BE DE ES IT
 
Event date:24.06.2004 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69823973
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20040624
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:16.12.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2221138 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:11.05.2005 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20050222
 
Event date:31.12.2005 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20051231
 
Event date:24.11.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20041124
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:31.12.2007 
Event description:BE: LAPSED
OWNER:*POTAIN
Effective DATE:20051231
 
Event date:28.02.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20121219
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:30.01.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20141117
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:27.03.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20150327
 
Event date:30.04.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20141223
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:30.04.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20131222
 
Event date:01.07.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 69823973 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160701
 
Event date:30.12.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20151221
 
Event date:02.04.2004 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:18.02.2004 
Event description:GRANT FEE PAID
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3
 
Event date:22.11.2003 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1
 
Event date:28.05.1999 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:25.03.2005 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
 
Event date:25.03.2005 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261