EP0940588 - Connecting piece for two small beams slidable therein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STEELCASE STRAFOR (S.A.) 56 Rue Jean Giraudoux F-67200 Strasbourg / FR | [1999/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flanet, Daniel 18, Place de la Liberté 67300 Schiltigheim / FR | [1999/36] | Representative(s) | Littolff, Denis Meyer & Partenaires 2 rue de Dublin 67300 Schiltigheim / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | Littolff, Denis Meyer & Partenaires, Conseils en Propriété Industrielle, Bureaux Europe, 20, place des Halles 67000 Strasbourg / FR | Application number, filing date | 98440041.6 | 02.03.1998 | [1999/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0940588 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0940588 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16B12/40, F16B12/32, A47B17/03 | [1999/36] | CPC: |
F16B12/32 (EP);
A47B17/033 (EP);
F16B12/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/36] | Title | German: | Verbindungsstück für zwei darin bewegbare Trägerprofile | [1999/36] | English: | Connecting piece for two small beams slidable therein | [1999/36] | French: | Pièce de liaison entre deux poutrelles qui y sont coulissables | [1999/36] | Examination procedure | 16.03.1998 | Examination requested [1999/36] | 16.03.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 10.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 25.05.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.2000 | FI | 20.12.2000 | IE | 20.12.2000 | SE | 20.12.2000 | LU | 02.03.2001 | DK | 20.03.2001 | PT | 20.03.2001 | GR | 23.03.2001 | MC | 31.03.2001 | [2007/29] |
Former [2006/39] | AT | 20.12.2000 | |
FI | 20.12.2000 | ||
IE | 20.12.2000 | ||
SE | 20.12.2000 | ||
DK | 20.03.2001 | ||
PT | 20.03.2001 | ||
GR | 23.03.2001 | ||
MC | 31.03.2001 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 20.12.2000 | |
FI | 20.12.2000 | ||
IE | 20.12.2000 | ||
SE | 20.12.2000 | ||
DK | 20.03.2001 | ||
PT | 20.03.2001 | ||
GR | 23.03.2001 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 20.12.2000 | |
FI | 20.12.2000 | ||
IE | 20.12.2000 | ||
SE | 20.12.2000 | ||
DK | 20.03.2001 | ||
PT | 20.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 20.12.2000 | |
FI | 20.12.2000 | ||
IE | 20.12.2000 | ||
SE | 20.12.2000 | ||
PT | 20.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/14] | AT | 20.12.2000 | |
FI | 20.12.2000 | ||
IE | 20.12.2000 | ||
PT | 20.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/11] | AT | 20.12.2000 | |
FI | 20.12.2000 | ||
PT | 20.03.2001 | ||
Former [2001/37] | AT | 20.12.2000 | |
FI | 20.12.2000 | ||
Former [2001/29] | FI | 20.12.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1526947 (CIE DE REALISATIONS IND ET TEC) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2497885 (NEMOZ JEAN CLAUDE [FR]) [A] 1* figure 4 *; | [XA]DE4127127 (HUELSTA WERKE HUELS KG [DE]) [X] 1,6 * the whole document * [A] 2,10 |