EP0987917 - Method of cell data transmission, cell, communication system and corresponding network terminal unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Canada Inc. 600 March Road, P.O. Box 13600 Kanata, Ontario K2K 2E6 / CA | [2007/08] |
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states NEWBRIDGE NETWORKS CORPORATION 600 March Road, P.O. Box 13600 Kanata, Ontario K2K 2E6 / CA | ||
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states Newbridge Networks Corporation 600 March Road, P.O. Box 13600 Kanata, Ontario K2K 2E6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Normand, Dominique 3, Square des Saudrais 35170 Bruz / FR | 02 /
André, Marc 101, Rue du Réage 35510 Cesson Sevigne / FR | 03 /
Malorey, Didier Le Clos Robert 35250 Chevaigné / FR | 04 /
Ambrosio, Esabel 6, Allée des Glières 35135 Chantepie / FR | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Vidon Technopole Atalante 16B Rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Patrice Vidon, Immeuble Germanium, 80, Avenue des Buttes-de-Coesmes 35700 Rennes / FR | Application number, filing date | 98460038.7 | 18.09.1998 | [2000/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0987917 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0987917 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/48] |
Former [2000/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur zellularen Datenübertragung, Zelle, Kommunikationssystem und entsprechendes Netz-Endgerät | [2006/24] | English: | Method of cell data transmission, cell, communication system and corresponding network terminal unit | [2000/12] | French: | Procédé de transmission de données organisées en cellules, cellule, système de communication et unité terminale de réseau correspondante | [2006/24] |
Former [2000/12] | Verfahren zur Zellulären Datenkommunikation, Zell, Kommunikationssystem und Netz-Endgerät | ||
Former [2000/12] | "Procédé de transmission de données organisées en cellules, cellule, système de communication et d'unité terminale de réseau correspondante" | Examination procedure | 17.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 29.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5745837 (FUHRMANN AMIR MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 58, line 11 - column 59, line 2 * * column 59, lines 37-44 * * column 61, lines 1-5 * * column 62, lines 6-15 * | [X] - RAYCHAUDHURI D, "ATM BASED TRANSPORT ARCHITECTURE FOR MULTISERVICES WIRELESS PERSONAL COMMUNICATION NETWORKS", SERVING HUMANITY THROUGH COMMUNICATIONS. SUPERCOMM/ICC, NEW ORLEANS, MAY 1 - 5, 1994, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19940501), vol. 1, pages 559 - 565, XP000438976 [X] 1,2,8,14-16 * figure 2 * * figure 4 * * page 564, column L, line 41 - column R, line 16 * |