EP0913346 - Belt conveyor and corresponding endless belt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2003 [2003/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BMTS Z.A. des Quatre Nations 44360 Vigneux de Bretagne / FR | [1999/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boursier, Marcel Le Pré Dupont 44310 Saint-Colomban / FR | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Vidon Technopole Atalante 16B Rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Patrice Vidon, Immeuble Germanium, 80, Avenue des Buttes-de-Coesmes 35700 Rennes / FR | Application number, filing date | 98460045.2 | 21.10.1998 | [1999/18] | Priority number, date | FR19970013412 | 21.10.1997 Original published format: FR 9713412 | [1999/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0913346 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65G21/06, B65G15/42 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
B65G15/46 (EP);
B65G15/00 (EP);
B65G15/60 (EP);
B65G21/06 (EP);
B65G21/10 (EP);
B65G23/06 (EP);
B65G2201/06 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/16] |
Former [2000/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | ||
Former [1999/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bandförderer und entsprechendes endloses Band | [1999/18] | English: | Belt conveyor and corresponding endless belt | [1999/18] | French: | Convoyeur à bande transporteuse et bande transporteuse correspondante | [1999/18] | Examination procedure | 23.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/51] | 09.11.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY | 29.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/40] | 22.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3238788 (SEITZ ENZINGER NOLL MASCH [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [YA]EP0499455 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * column 7, line 49 - column 8, line 13; figures 6,7; claim - * [A] 8,10; | [A]EP0538674 (REXING GUENTER [DE]) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]DE3923442 (WEBER HANS JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1,8,11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0120996 (MONTECH AG [CH]) [A] 5 * abstract *; | [A]GB1545063 (KLINKICHT H) [A] 1,8,9,11,12 * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | FR2663309 | EP0312643 | EP0540769 | US5137145 | FR2476042 |