EP0893641 - Device for connecting two pipe elements and use of such a pipe element connection device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain PAM 91, Avenue de la Libération 54000 Nancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN PAM 91, Avenue de la Libération 54000 Nancy / FR | ||
Former [1999/04] | For all designated states PONT-A-MOUSSON S.A. 91, Avenue de la Libération 54000 Nancy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vitel, Jean-Pierre 9, Rue Clinchant 54470 Thiaucourt-Regnieville / FR | 02 /
Favier, Noel 45, Rue Bellevue 54380 Dieulouard / FR | 03 /
Schneider, André 21, Allée Pierre Lallement, Pré Latour 54700 Pont-à-Mousson / FR | 04 /
Lescot, Didier 21, Rue Pierregaud 54200 Toul / FR | 05 /
Bourgin, René 191, Rue de la Heurlotte 54700 Montauville / FR | [1999/04] | Representative(s) | Puit, Thierry, et al Saint-Gobain PAM Service Propriété Industrielle, BP 109 54704 Pont-à-Mousson Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/04] | Puit, Thierry, et al PONT-A-MOUSSON S.A. / DDPP, Service Propriété Industrielle, BP 109 54704 Pont-à-Mousson Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 98470015.3 | 13.07.1998 | [1999/04] | Priority number, date | FR19970009518 | 25.07.1997 Original published format: FR 9709518 | [1999/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0893641 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0893641 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16L23/024, F16L23/028 | [1999/04] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/40] |
Former [1999/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | SI | 24.07.1998 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verbinden von zwei Rohrstücken und Anwendung der Verbindung von Rohrstücken | [1999/04] | English: | Device for connecting two pipe elements and use of such a pipe element connection device | [1999/04] | French: | Dispositif pour l'assemblage de deux éléments de canalisation, et assemblages d'éléments de canalisation en comportant application | [1999/04] | Examination procedure | 12.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/36] | 05.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1555582 (EMERIJ) [A] 1,2,9-11,16,17 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE2010020 (THE DUNLOP COMPANY) [A] 1,2 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR2357810 (CENTAURUS AG [CH]) [A] 1,2 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]GB2057616 (THEOHARIS A A) [A] 1* figures 1-2A *; | [A]DE19525157 (PUSPAS ARMATUREN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [AP]EP0794378 (FISCHER GEORG WAGA NV [NL]) [AP] 1 * abstract * |