EP0931556 - Used needles collecting receptacle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ranson, Marie Noelle 55 rue de la Comédie 59500 Douai / FR | [1999/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/30] | Representative(s) | Ecrepont, Robert Cabinet Ecrepont 27bis, rue du Vieux-Faubourg 59800 Lille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/30] | Ecrepont, Robert Cabinet Ecrepont 12 Place Simon Vollant 59800 Lille / FR | Application number, filing date | 98490006.8 | 23.01.1998 | [1999/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0931556 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/32 | [1999/30] | CPC: |
A61M5/3278 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/30] | Title | German: | Sammelbehälter zur Aufnahme gebrauchter Nadeln | [1999/30] | English: | Used needles collecting receptacle | [1999/30] | French: | Récipient de collecte des aiguilles souillées | [1999/30] | Examination procedure | 03.04.1998 | Examination requested [1999/30] | 13.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/05] | 27.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | For: | all designated states | Licencee: | Société PLASTIQUES GOSSELIN 123 ROUTE DE CAESTRE BORRE 59190 / FR | Date: | 01.12.1999 | [2000/07] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4614035 (ANDREWS WILLIAM M [US]) [X] 1,7 * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 19 * * figures 24-27 *; | [A]EP0461060 (ARGUEESO GAMA FRANCISCO JAVIER [ES]) [A] 2,4 * column 3, line 32 - line 37 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0691279 (DRG PLASTICS LIMITED [GB]) [A] 3 * column 4, line 7 - line 11 * * figure 2 *; | [A]NL8701634 (MR ALOF JAN WOLT) [A] 5,6,8 * page 5, line 3 - line 15 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US4520926 (NELSON RALPH E [US]) [A] 9 * column 3, line 3 - line 4 * |