EP0965687 - Street furniture element and method of manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Couvidou, Alain Boulevard de la Fosse 7 62670 Mazingarbe / FR | [1999/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/51] | Representative(s) | Lepage, Jean-Pierre c/o Innovations et Prestations S.A. 23-25, rue Nicolas Leblanc Boîte Postale 1069 59011 Lille Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | Lepage, Jean-Pierre c/o Innovations et Prestations S.A., 23-25, rue Nicolas Leblanc, Boîte Postale 1069 59011 Lille Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 98490018.3 | 17.06.1998 | [1999/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0965687 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0965687 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E01F9/00, E01F9/016, E01F9/053 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
E01F9/547 (EP);
E01F9/20 (EP);
E01F9/617 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, ES, FR, GB, IE [2000/35] |
Former [1999/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Strassenmöbelelement und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1999/51] | English: | Street furniture element and method of manufacture | [1999/51] | French: | Elément de mobilier urbain et procédé de fabrication de cet élément | [1999/51] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 02.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 17.09.2003 | IE | 17.09.2003 | ES | 28.12.2003 | [2004/46] |
Former [2004/45] | GB | 17.09.2003 | |
IE | 17.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | IE | 17.09.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0390749 (INNOVAZIONE SRL) [X] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE19503430 (H. RINN) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 6 * * column 3, line 54 - line 58 * * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 32; figure 3 *; | [Y]US4744014 (E.H. HARRIS) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, line 27 - line 53; figure 3 *; | [A]GB2128664 (SHO BOND CONST;HITACHI HEATING APPL) [A] 1-3,6 * page 1, line 44 - page 2, line 34; figure - *; | [A]EP0539615 (DAITO SANGYO CO LTD ;NIPPO CO LTD (JP)) [A] 1,5 * column 7, line 4 - column 10, line 49; figure 2 * |