EP0854223 - Improved closing system in plastic tank for washing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Balay, S.A. Avenida de la Industria, 49 50059 Zaragoza / ES | [2000/20] |
Former [1998/30] | For all designated states Balay S.A. Avda. de la Industria 49 50059 Zaragoza / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boved, Ismael Gracia Balay S.A., Avda. de la Industria 49 50059 Zaragoza / ES | [1998/30] | Representative(s) | Richter, Harald, et al BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Zentralabteilung Gewerblicher Rechtsschutz Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | Richter, Harald, et al BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH, Postfach 10 02 50 80076 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98500012.4 | 20.01.1998 | [1998/30] | Priority number, date | ES19970000103 | 21.01.1997 Original published format: ES 9700103 | [1998/30] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0854223 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0854223 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | [1998/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0854223 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/26 | [1998/30] | CPC: |
D06F37/262 (EP);
D06F37/263 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/25] |
Former [1998/30] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schliessvorrichtung eines Kunststoff-Laugenbehälters einer Waschmaschine | [1998/30] | English: | Improved closing system in plastic tank for washing machine | [1998/30] | French: | Dispositif de fermeture pour cuve en plastique de machine à laver | [1998/30] | Examination procedure | 05.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/15] | 18.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0272949 (CIAPEM) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *; | [A]FR1513957 (ROBERT BOSCH HAUSGERÄTE GMBH) [A] 1 * figure 8 * | Examination | EP0103418 | EP0497109 | EP0152745 |