EP0884533 - Gas tap with flame safety device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.2004 [2004/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FAGOR, S.COOP. Apartado, 67, Barrio San Andrés, s/n 20500 Mondragon (Guipuzcoa) / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | For all designated states FAGOR, S.Coop Apartado, 67, Barrio San Andrés, s/n 20500 Mondragon (Guipuzcoa) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ayastuy Aretxaga, Inaki Caserio Gaztelu, Altos Hornos 20570 Bergara (Guipuzcoa) / ES | [1998/51] | Application number, filing date | 98500067.8 | 12.03.1998 | [1998/51] | Priority number, date | ES19970001650U | 09.06.1997 Original published format: ES 9701650 U | [1998/51] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0884533 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0884533 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0884533 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F23N5/10 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
F23N5/107 (EP);
F23N2235/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/51] |
Former [1998/51] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gashahn mit einer Flammensicherheitsvorrichtung | [1998/51] | English: | Gas tap with flame safety device | [1998/51] | French: | Robinet à gaz avec un dispositif de sécurité de flamme | [1998/51] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 13.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2261495 (FAGOR S COOP LTDA [ES]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [PA]DE19616797 (IMIT SPA [IT]) [PA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR2659130 (SOURDILLON SA [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE4441926 (SOURDILLON SA [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | ES1019084U |