EP0918221 - Apparatus for performing laboratory tests automatically [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grifols, S.A. Marina, 16-18 Torre Mapfre - Pl. 26 08005 Barcelona / ES | [2006/36] |
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states Grifols, S.A. Marina, 16-18 Torre Mapfre - Pl. 26 08005 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states Probitas Pharma, S.A. c/ De la Marina, 16-18, Torre Mapfre, planta 26 08005 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [1999/21] | For all designated states Grupo Grifols, S.A. Poligono Levante-Can Guasch, 2 08150 Parets Del Valles, Barcelona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alonso Riera, Enric Sant Josep Oriol, 6 08339 Vilassar de Dalt (Barcelona) / ES | 02 /
Perez, Puigdomènech, Fransesc Nova, 125 1 4a 08530 La Carriga / ES | 03 /
Pomar Longedo, Pere Entenza, 103, 4 2a 08015 Barcelona / ES | 04 /
Pons Munill, Xavier Pla de l'Ametllera, 5 1 08225 Terrassa (Barcelona) / ES | 05 /
Restrepo Guerrero, Carlos Bailén, 195, 2 4a 08037 Barcelona / ES | 06 /
Twose Valls, Ivan Elisa, 12 2 08023 Barcelona / ES | [1999/21] | Representative(s) | Durán Moya, Luis-Alfonso, et al DURAN-CORRETJER Còrsega, 329 (Paseo de Gracia/Diagonal) 08037 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1999/21] | Duran Moya, Luis-Alfonso, et al DURAN-CORRETJER, S.L., Paseo de Gracia, 101 08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 98500249.2 | 18.11.1998 | [1999/21] | Priority number, date | ES19970002412 | 19.11.1997 Original published format: ES 9702412 | ES19970002413 | 19.11.1997 Original published format: ES 9702413 | ES19970002414 | 19.11.1997 Original published format: ES 9702414 | ES19970002415 | 19.11.1997 Original published format: ES 9702415 | [1999/21] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0918221 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0918221 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | [2001/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0918221 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/02, G01N35/04 | [1999/21] | CPC: |
G01N35/028 (EP,US);
G01N2035/042 (EP,US);
Y10T436/11 (EP,US);
Y10T436/113332 (EP,US);
Y10T436/114165 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25 (EP,US);
Y10T436/2575 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT [2001/41] |
Former [2001/40] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT | ||
Former [1999/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur automatischen Durchführung von Laboratoriumprüfungen | [1999/21] | English: | Apparatus for performing laboratory tests automatically | [1999/21] | French: | Appareil pour réaliser automatiquement des tests de laboratoire | [1999/21] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/15] | 19.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2006 | BE | 06.09.2006 | CH | 06.09.2006 | FI | 06.09.2006 | LI | 06.09.2006 | NL | 06.09.2006 | IE | 20.11.2006 | PT | 19.02.2007 | [2008/15] |
Former [2007/29] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | CH | 06.09.2006 | |
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/17] | CH | 06.09.2006 | |
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4287155 (TERSTEEG GLENN E, et al) [A] 10 * column A; figure 4 *; | [X]US4478095 (BRADLEY MARTIN P T [US], et al) [X] 13-18 * column 2, line 20 - line 36 * * column 4, line 15 - line 65 * * column 5, line 24 - line 26 *; | [X]US4595562 (LISTON MAX D [US], et al) [X] 13 * column 6, line 65 - column 8, line 21; figures 9,10 *; | [Y]EP0351988 (QUATRO BIOSYSTEMS LTD [GB]) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 7 * * column 4, line 27 - column 4, line 55; figure - *; | [A]EP0441755 (CHEMILA SRL [IT]) [A] 10 * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 3; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9309440 (BAXTER DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [A] 2,8,8 * page 29, line 31 - page 30, line 11; figures 3,5,6,19-22 * * page 18, line 10 - line 17; figures 7,11,12 * [A] ; | [X]WO9312431 (BAXTER DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 16, line 5 - line 21 * * page 38, line 1 - line 8; figures 1,26-31 * * page 40, line 30 - page 41, line 21; figures 1,31,32 * * page 43, line 11 - line 33; figure 33 * * page 63, line 14 - line 27; figures 1,53 * * page 80, line 6 - line 18; figures 1,6-8 *; | [A]EP0639774 (TOA MEDICAL ELECTRONICS [JP]) [A] 13-20 * abstract *; | [A]US5551828 (ILES KENNETH E [US]) [A] 13,19 * column 3, line 13 - line 30 ** column 5, line 43 - column 6, line 21 *; | [YA] - LITTLE J N ET AL, "RECENT ADVANCES IN ROBOTIC AUTOMATION OF MICROPLATE ASSAYS", LABORATORY AUTOMATION & INFORMATION MANAGEMENT,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., AMSTERDAM, (19941101), vol. 26, no. 2, ISSN 1381-141X, pages 89 - 99, XP000476920 [Y] 1 * page 96, column 2, line 1 - page 98, column 2, line 2; figures 17-20 * * page 93, column 2 - page 94, column 1; figure 7 * * page 95, column 2; figure 10 * [A] 8 |