EP0936847 - Electronic integration in service boxes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MECANISMOS AUXILIARES INDUSTRIALES S.A. M.A.I.S.A. Passeig de l'Estacio, 14 E-43800 Valls Tarragona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1999/33] | For all designated states MECANISMOS AUXILIARES INDUSTRIALES S.A. M.A.I.S.A. Passeig de l'Estacio, 14 E-43800 Valls, Tarragona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arragones Carreta, Alberto Passeig de l'Estacio, 14 43800 Valls (Tarragona) / ES | [1999/33] | Representative(s) | Primo de Rivera y Urquijo, Jose A. General Martinez Campos, 51 28010 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Primo de Rivera y Urquijo, Jose Antonio General Martinez Campos, 51 28010 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [1999/33] | Morgades Manonelles, Juan Antonio Calle Valencia, 300 - entresuelo 1a 08009 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 98500253.4 | 24.11.1998 | [1999/33] | Priority number, date | ES19970002457 | 25.11.1997 Original published format: ES 9702457 | [1999/33] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0936847 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/02, H05K1/14, B60R16/02 | [1999/33] | CPC: |
B60R16/0239 (EP);
H05K1/0265 (EP);
H05K1/14 (EP);
H01H50/048 (EP);
H05K1/0298 (EP);
H05K1/141 (EP);
H05K1/144 (EP);
H05K1/148 (EP);
H05K2201/0352 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/17] |
Former [1999/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektronische Integration in Anschlusskästen | [1999/33] | English: | Electronic integration in service boxes | [1999/33] | French: | Intégration électronique dans des boîtes de service | [1999/33] | Examination procedure | 01.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 23.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/33] | 18.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]GB2304234 (MAISA) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]GB2263817 (MAISA) [DA] 1,5 * abstract *; | [A]US5513077 (STRIBEL) [A] 1,4 * column A; figure - *; | [A]US4944684 (LEIBOWITZ) [A] 1,5 * column A; figure - * |