EP0930809 - Procedure and device for the power supply of fluorescent discharge lamps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Juan Roura y Cia., S.A. Mallorca, 346 08013 Barcelona / ES | [1999/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roura Ares, Juan Mallorca, 346 08013 Barcelona / ES | [1999/29] | Representative(s) | Durán Moya, Luis-Alfonso, et al DURAN-CORRETJER Còrsega, 329 (Paseo de Gracia/Diagonal) 08037 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | Duran Moya, Luis-Alfonso, et al DURAN-CORRETJER, S.L., Paseo de Gracia, 101 08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 98500274.0 | 16.12.1998 | [1999/29] | Priority number, date | ES19970002617 | 17.12.1997 Original published format: ES 9702617 | [1999/29] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0930809 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0930809 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | [2000/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0930809 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/46 | [1999/29] | CPC: |
H05B41/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/46] |
Former [2000/44] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1999/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zum Betreiben von Leuchtstofflampen | [1999/29] | English: | Procedure and device for the power supply of fluorescent discharge lamps | [1999/29] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour alimenter des lampes fluorescentes | [1999/29] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 14.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.11.2003 | BE | 12.11.2003 | CH | 12.11.2003 | FI | 12.11.2003 | FR | 12.11.2003 | IT | 12.11.2003 | LI | 12.11.2003 | NL | 12.11.2003 | CY | 16.12.2003 | IE | 16.12.2003 | LU | 16.12.2003 | MC | 31.12.2003 | DK | 12.02.2004 | GB | 12.02.2004 | GR | 12.02.2004 | SE | 12.02.2004 | DE | 13.02.2004 | ES | 23.02.2004 | PT | 12.04.2004 | [2008/15] |
Former [2007/30] | AT | 12.11.2003 | |
BE | 12.11.2003 | ||
CH | 12.11.2003 | ||
FI | 12.11.2003 | ||
FR | 12.11.2003 | ||
LI | 12.11.2003 | ||
NL | 12.11.2003 | ||
CY | 16.12.2003 | ||
IE | 16.12.2003 | ||
LU | 16.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
DK | 12.02.2004 | ||
GB | 12.02.2004 | ||
GR | 12.02.2004 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
DE | 13.02.2004 | ||
ES | 23.02.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 12.11.2003 | |
BE | 12.11.2003 | ||
CH | 12.11.2003 | ||
FI | 12.11.2003 | ||
FR | 12.11.2003 | ||
LI | 12.11.2003 | ||
NL | 12.11.2003 | ||
CY | 16.12.2003 | ||
IE | 16.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
LU | 12.01.2004 | ||
DK | 12.02.2004 | ||
GB | 12.02.2004 | ||
GR | 12.02.2004 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
DE | 13.02.2004 | ||
ES | 23.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/16] | AT | 12.11.2003 | |
BE | 12.11.2003 | ||
CH | 12.11.2003 | ||
FI | 12.11.2003 | ||
LI | 12.11.2003 | ||
NL | 12.11.2003 | ||
CY | 16.12.2003 | ||
IE | 16.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
LU | 12.01.2004 | ||
DK | 12.02.2004 | ||
GB | 12.02.2004 | ||
GR | 12.02.2004 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
DE | 13.02.2004 | ||
ES | 23.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | AT | 12.11.2003 | |
BE | 12.11.2003 | ||
CH | 12.11.2003 | ||
FI | 12.11.2003 | ||
LI | 12.11.2003 | ||
NL | 12.11.2003 | ||
CY | 16.12.2003 | ||
IE | 16.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
DK | 12.02.2004 | ||
GB | 12.02.2004 | ||
GR | 12.02.2004 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
DE | 13.02.2004 | ||
ES | 23.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 12.11.2003 | |
BE | 12.11.2003 | ||
CH | 12.11.2003 | ||
FI | 12.11.2003 | ||
LI | 12.11.2003 | ||
NL | 12.11.2003 | ||
CY | 16.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
DK | 12.02.2004 | ||
GB | 12.02.2004 | ||
GR | 12.02.2004 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
DE | 13.02.2004 | ||
ES | 23.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 12.11.2003 | |
BE | 12.11.2003 | ||
CH | 12.11.2003 | ||
FI | 12.11.2003 | ||
LI | 12.11.2003 | ||
NL | 12.11.2003 | ||
CY | 16.12.2003 | ||
DK | 12.02.2004 | ||
GB | 12.02.2004 | ||
GR | 12.02.2004 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
DE | 13.02.2004 | ||
ES | 23.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | AT | 12.11.2003 | |
BE | 12.11.2003 | ||
CH | 12.11.2003 | ||
FI | 12.11.2003 | ||
LI | 12.11.2003 | ||
NL | 12.11.2003 | ||
CY | 16.12.2003 | ||
DK | 12.02.2004 | ||
GR | 12.02.2004 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
DE | 13.02.2004 | ||
ES | 23.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 12.11.2003 | |
CH | 12.11.2003 | ||
FI | 12.11.2003 | ||
LI | 12.11.2003 | ||
NL | 12.11.2003 | ||
CY | 16.12.2003 | ||
DK | 12.02.2004 | ||
GR | 12.02.2004 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
DE | 13.02.2004 | ||
ES | 23.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 12.11.2003 | |
CH | 12.11.2003 | ||
FI | 12.11.2003 | ||
LI | 12.11.2003 | ||
NL | 12.11.2003 | ||
CY | 16.12.2003 | ||
DK | 12.02.2004 | ||
GR | 12.02.2004 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
DE | 13.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 12.11.2003 | |
CH | 12.11.2003 | ||
FI | 12.11.2003 | ||
LI | 12.11.2003 | ||
NL | 12.11.2003 | ||
CY | 16.12.2003 | ||
DK | 12.02.2004 | ||
GR | 12.02.2004 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 12.11.2003 | |
CH | 12.11.2003 | ||
FI | 12.11.2003 | ||
LI | 12.11.2003 | ||
NL | 12.11.2003 | ||
CY | 16.12.2003 | ||
GR | 12.02.2004 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 12.11.2003 | |
CH | 12.11.2003 | ||
FI | 12.11.2003 | ||
LI | 12.11.2003 | ||
NL | 12.11.2003 | ||
GR | 12.02.2004 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 12.11.2003 | |
FI | 12.11.2003 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 12.11.2003 | |
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 12.02.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH03171605 ; | [A]JPH0696893 ; | [X]DE2612343 (NEON ES FENYCSOEBERENDEZESEKET) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3116933 (SCHUCH LICHTTECH KG ADOLF [DE]); | [XY]US4862038 (MORTEN JOHN F [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 32 - column 4, line 61; figures 1-3 * [Y] 2; | [A]US5089943 (WOELFELSCHNEIDER LOTHAR [DE]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911021), vol. 015, no. 412, Database accession no. (E - 1124), & JP03171605 A 19910725 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940705), vol. 018, no. 355, Database accession no. (E - 1573), & JP06096893 A 19940408 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOL CORP) [A] * abstract * |