EP0852911 - A process for preparing a particulate product from spent grains and a particulate product obtainable by said method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2003 [2003/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aarup, Anton 42 Skjernvej 6920 Videbaek / DK | [1998/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/29] | Representative(s) | Bagger-Soerensen, Birgitte, et al Internationalt Patent-Bureau A/S Rigensgade 11 1316 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1998/29] | Bagger-Soerensen, Birgitte, et al Internationalt Patent-Bureau, 23, Hoje Taastrup Boulevard 2630 Taastrup / DK | Application number, filing date | 98610002.2 | 14.01.1998 | [1998/29] | Priority number, date | DK19970000015 | 14.01.1997 Original published format: DK 1597 | [1998/29] | Filing language | DA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0852911 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0852911 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | [1999/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/185, A23P1/14, A23L1/314, A23L1/308, A23L1/10, A23L1/305, A23L1/317, C12F3/06 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
A23L13/65 (EP);
A23L33/175 (EP);
A23L33/185 (EP);
A23L33/22 (EP);
A23L7/115 (EP);
A23L7/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/29] | A23L1/185, A23P1/14, A23L1/314, A23L1/308, A23L1/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/32] |
Former [2000/31] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, LI, LU, NL, SE | ||
Former [1998/29] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von teilchenförmigen Product aus Treber und damit erhältliches teilchenförmiges Produkt | [1998/29] | English: | A process for preparing a particulate product from spent grains and a particulate product obtainable by said method | [1998/29] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un produit particulaire à partir de drêches et produit particulaire obtenu | [1998/29] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/35] | 28.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/04] | 16.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0050330 (WICKUELER KUEPPER BRAUEREI KG) [X] 1,2,4,6-11 * claims 1,10,11 * * figure 1 * * page 3, paragraph 3 * * page 6, paragraph 1 *; | [X]US3721568 (WILSON J) [X] 1,4,6,8,10,11 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0058651 (SVENSK EXERGITEKNIK AB) [X] 1,2,4,8-11 * claims 1,2,6 * * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 4 * * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 30 * * page 10, line 27 - line 33 * * page 11, line 18 - page 12, line 11 * * page 17, line 24 - line 15 *; | [X]CN1078866 ; | [X]DE4243879 (KIENLIN LUTZ) [X] 8-11 * claim - * * page 2, line 34 - line 42 * * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 46 *; | [X]DE2333387 (HODAPP FERDINAND DIPL BRAUMSTR) [X] 8-11 * the whole document * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1997-109644, XP002117212 & CN1078866 A 19931201 (AQUATIC TECHNOLOGY DEV CO CHINA AQUATIC) [X] 1,6,8 * abstract * |