EP0887783 - Moving display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Light Spin Ltd. Building 3, Kiryat Weizmann Science Park 70400 Ness Ziona / IL | [1999/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Malkin, Sergay Shlomzion 10/9 Ramat Gan 52336 / IL | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | McCarthy, Denis Alexis, et al MacLachlan & Donaldson Unit 10, 4075 Kingswood Road Citywest Business Campus Dublin D24 C56E / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | McCarthy, Denis Alexis, et al MacLachlan & Donaldson 47 Merrion Square Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 98650038.7 | 25.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | US19970883002 | 26.06.1997 Original published format: US 883002 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0887783 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/53] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0887783 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | [1999/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/00 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
G09G3/005 (EP,US);
H04N13/393 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2000/07] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Anzeigeeinrichtung mit sich bewegenden Anzeigeelementen | [1999/01] | English: | Moving display | [1999/01] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage comportant des éléments d'affichage mobiles | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 29.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 13.12.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) ES, FR, IT | 03.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/27] | 07.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.01.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.01.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]GB2093617 (LOCK TREVOR JOHN, et al) [DA] 1-7,21 * page 1, line 95 - page 3, line 22; figures 2,3 *; | [A]GB2095068 (COLLENDER ROBERT R) [A] 14-17* page 6, line 11 - page 7, line 22; figure 11 *; | [A]WO8302352 (DASH STRAUS ASSOCIATES [US]) [A] 13 * abstract *; | [A]US5057827 (NOBILE FRED E [US], et al) [A] 1-7,9 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 30 * * column 5, line 18 - column 6, line 4 * * figures 1,2,8 *; | [XA]GB2280059 (SCITEX CORP LTD [IL]) [X] 1,9 * page 5, paragraph 1 - page 16, paragraph 3; figures 1-3,5,6 * [A] 2-7 |